This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:30:45 (UTC).

KEVIN J. STALTER VS. THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 KEVIN J STALTER filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6520

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STALTER KEVIN J.

Defendants

DOES 1-10

GLADSTEIN JAY DR.

FERRANTE DAVID

GERLE MIKE

GOLDSTEIN GARY

EDEWARDS JONATHAN

VALDIVIA RICK

THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION

GOLDSTEIN JULIAN

ORION JASON

GOLDBERG MARK LEE

ALAN AARON

SWARTZ ERIC DR.

SHALSON AXEL

DUESENBERG INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC

TOPA MANAGEMENT COMPANY

BROOKS JAMES R.

Others

MONTGOMERY JAMES I.

LITTLER MENDELSON P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOWEN WILLIAM D.

MAKI LISA L. C/O SHEGERIAN & ASSC

BOWEN WILLIAM DALEBOUT

Defendant Attorneys

MONTGOMERY JAMES I.

OGLETREE DEAKINS SMOAK & STEWART

LITTLER MENDELSON P.C.

HARTLEY CLAIRE ELYSE

BARBER JOHN L.

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER SENET & WITTBRO

COCHRAN DAVIS & ASSOCIATES

VIGIL HEATHER M.

PECK HEATHER M.

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH

 

Court Documents

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

10/13/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

10/13/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

10/19/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

10/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

11/2/2017: Minute Order

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:29 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Supboena) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by KEVIN J. STALTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to continue trial); Filed by THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial (legal fi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
296 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION (Defendant); JAY DR. GLADSTEIN (Defendant); JONATHAN EDEWARDS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION (Defendant); JAY DR. GLADSTEIN (Defendant); JONATHAN EDEWARDS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION (Defendant); JAY DR. GLADSTEIN (Defendant); JONATHAN EDEWARDS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION (Defendant); JAY DR. GLADSTEIN (Defendant); JONATHAN EDEWARDS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEVIN J. STALTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/1971
  • DocketDeclaration (OF HEATHER M. VIGIL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/1971
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by THRIVE TRIBE FOUNDATION (Defendant); JAY DR. GLADSTEIN (Defendant); JONATHAN EDEWARDS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOPA MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LITTLER MENDELSON P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where DUESENBERG INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant