Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 22:20:58 (UTC).

KEVIN HILL VS. THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP,INC. ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2012 KEVIN HILL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD A. STONE, GERALD ROSENBERG and NORMAN P. TARLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6093

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD A. STONE

GERALD ROSENBERG

NORMAN P. TARLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL KEVIN

Defendants

CHAVARRIA MARYANA

MOYER KENT

PEREZ DAVID

WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC. THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONWAY JACK K.

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY & GMELICH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • Notice-Case Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Declaration (Nazo L. Koulloukian ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Response (TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC. is a litigant