Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2020 at 20:05:28 (UTC).

KEVIN HARR VS ROZWOOD & COMPANY, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 08/02/2016 KEVIN HARR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROZWOOD COMPANY, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6213

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARR KEVIN

Defendants, Assignees and Cross Defendants

ROZWOOD & COMPANY

MEHREZ DIANE

PRIVATE MORTGAGE FUND LLC

BATRIZ CARMEN

CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

YOUNG DARREN S.

ROZWOOD S. BENJAMIN

CMB PROFESSIONAL SERVICES

LOS ANGELES COUNTY CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE

SOKOLOW VALERIE

DLI PROPERTIES LLC

CARRIGAN RICHARD

BATRIZ CARMEN DBA CMB PROFESSIONAL SERVICES

FREP CAPITAL LLC

CARRIGAN MELISSA

ROZWOOD BENJAMIN

STRATEGIC ACQUISTIONS INC.

Defendant and Assignee

MEHREZ DIANE

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

YOUNG DARREN S.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUMPHREY J. SCOTT

HUMPHREY JEFFREY SCOTT

GRANT JAMES TAYLOR

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS ESQ. LEE D

WILLIAMS LEE DWAIN

WICKHAM MARY CONWAY

PANICKER SAYUJ

COHEN HARRIS L.

MARY C. WICKHAM

FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

PHILLIPS MARTIN W.

PHILLIPS MARTIN WILLIAM

SHOWKATIAN SARA YASMINE

SAYUJ PANICKER

KILKOWSKI JAMES MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE QUIET TITLE; NON-JURY ...)

7/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE QUIET TITLE; NON-JURY ...)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

8/24/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Case Management Statement

11/18/2016: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-01-19 00:00:00

1/19/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-01-19 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

4/3/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

4/4/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Motion

4/4/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Motion

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

6/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint

7/17/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

8/11/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-08-11 00:00:00

8/11/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-08-11 00:00:00

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/16/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

11/13/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

11/21/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case - Case #SS0288661 and Case #SD023011

12/20/2017: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case - Case #SS0288661 and Case #SD023011

Case Management Statement

1/30/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/8/2019: Case Management Statement

196 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion - Other (for 1) Turnover Order, or Writ, of Possessio, Enforcing Plaintiff's Judgment of Possession Against $975,000 of "Surplus Proceeds" From 6/30/2017 Sale of 491 S. Spaulding Drive; and 2) Order Vacating Voluntary Dismissals of Claims in This Case Against Def) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for 1) Turnover Order, or Writ,...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketReply (Harr Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Enforce Judgment of Possession); Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketOpposition (of Defendant Los Angeles County Child Support Services To Plaintiff's Motion (1) Turnover Order, Or Writ Of Possession, Enforcing Plaintiff's Judgment Of Possession (2) Order Vacating Voluntary Dismissals Of Claims); Filed by Los Angeles County Child Support Service (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion - Other (to Enforce Judgment of Possession and Vacate Voluntary Dismissals) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for1) Order Setting Shortened Briefing Schedule and Advancing Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Request for Turnover Order Enforcing Plaintiff's Judgment of Possession against $975,000 of "Surplus Sale Proceed"; 2) Order Setting Shortened Briefing Schedule ..) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for: 1) Order Set...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for: 1) Order Setting Shortened Briefing Schedule and Advancing Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Request for Turnover Order Enforcing Plaintiff's Judgment of Possession against $975,000 of "Surplus Sale Proceed"; 2) Order Setting Shortened Briefing Schedule ..); Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketOF J. SCOTT HUMPHREY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED 1/22/2020, AS CORRECTED; Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
371 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION INVOLVING REAL PROPERTY CLAIMS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kevin Harr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC126213    Hearing Date: September 08, 2020    Dept: O

Case: SC126213 Harr v. Rozwood, et. al.

Harr’s Motion to Vacate the Voluntary Dismissals of the Claimants in the Related Case is DENIED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIVATE MORTGAGE FUND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DLI PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS is a litigant

Latest cases where STRATEGIC AQUISITIONS INC is a litigant