Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2019 at 00:17:24 (UTC).

KEVIN D HILL VS CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BO

Case Summary

On 05/13/2011 KEVIN D HILL filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUIS A. LAVIN and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1869

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUIS A. LAVIN

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL KEVIN D.

Defendant

CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS

Interested Party

WORLD PROTECTION GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONWAY JACK K.

Defendant Attorney

MATSUMOTO PHILLIP J. DEPUTY ATTY. GEN.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE RE JUDICIAL REVIEW OF OF APPEALS BOARD DECISION AO-235735 WITH DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF MANDATE

5/17/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE RE JUDICIAL REVIEW OF OF APPEALS BOARD DECISION AO-235735 WITH DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF MANDATE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/27/2011: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

8/22/2011: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE PETITION FOR WRIT OF

8/30/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE PETITION FOR WRIT OF

PROOF OF SERVICE PETITION FOR WRIT

8/30/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE PETITION FOR WRIT

Minute Order

9/30/2011: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SERVICE; DECLARATION OF PHILLIP J. MATSIJMOTO

10/12/2011: NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SERVICE; DECLARATION OF PHILLIP J. MATSIJMOTO

PROOF OF SERVICE

11/18/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

11/30/2011: Minute Order

GENERAL DENIAL

12/21/2011: GENERAL DENIAL

Minute Order

4/24/2012: Minute Order

OPN)SH1ON BRIEF TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 10943

6/8/2012: OPN)SH1ON BRIEF TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 10943

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF JUDICIAL OFFICER; NOTICE OF RESET I ING OF HEARING RE PETITION! WRIT OF MANDATE

6/14/2012: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF JUDICIAL OFFICER; NOTICE OF RESET I ING OF HEARING RE PETITION! WRIT OF MANDATE

Minute Order

7/31/2012: Minute Order

DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF MANDATE

7/31/2012: DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF MANDATE

Minute Order

8/30/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/5/2012: Minute Order

RETURN TO WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE

1/7/2013: RETURN TO WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by California Unemployment Insurance Appeals (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • RETURN TO WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 82; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 82; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • JUDGMENT GRANTING WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2011
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE RE JUDICIAL REVIEW OF OF APPEALS BOARD DECISION AO-235735 WITH DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Kevin D. Hill (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD is a litigant