Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2019 at 00:45:46 (UTC).

KEVIN BANUELOS VS 218 PROPERTIES, LLC, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2014 KEVIN BANUELOS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against 218 PROPERTIES, LLC, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM BARRY and MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8000

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM BARRY

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANUELOS KEVIN

KEVIN BANUELOS

Defendants

218 PROPERTIES LLC

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

LA INVESTMENT LLC

R44 LENDING GROUP LLC

STARFLINGER PETER

PETER STARFLINGER

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

STAR PETER

LA INVESTMENT LLC AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

PETER STAR

218 PROPERTIES LLC UKNOWN ENTITY

Others

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

KLINEDIST PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPIX & MARTIN LAW OFFICE OF

LAW OFFICE OF SPIX & MARTIN

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS W. BECK & ASSOC.

LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS W. BECK&ASSOCIATES

PC KLINEDIST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 218 PROPERTIES, LLC, UKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); R44 LENDING GROUP, LLC (Defendant); LA INVESTMENT, LLC AN UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; (Motion to Strike; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KEVIN BANUELOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KEVIN BANUELOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KEVIN BANUELOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEVIN BANUELOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEVIN BANUELOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA INVESTMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 218 PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant