This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 14:40:29 (UTC).

KENNY JONES ET AL VS JOHNSON & JOHNSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2013 KENNY JONES filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN, EMILIE H. ELIAS and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1609

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

EMILIE H. ELIAS

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AKERBERG BARBARA

BARBER MARCIA

BODDY CAROLYN

BROWN VIVIAN

BURROWS ANNIE

CANFIELD LEON

FINELLI PATRICIA

FISHER ZABRINA

GARNER INEZ

GREEN BARBARA

GUYTON STELLA

HALBERSTADT TONYA

HOLMES GAIL

JONES KENNY

MCCALLUM BONNIE

PEARSON MARGARET

ROBILLARD TESSE

SANCHEZ ALEJANDRO

SLAVICH DIANA

TERRY DIANE

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SALIM-BEASLEY LLC

KIESEL LAW LLP

JAY HERDERSON PLLC

FIBICH HAMPTON LEEBRON BRIGGS & JOSEPHSON

Other Attorneys

BARNES & THORNBURG LLP

PATTERSON BELKNAP WEBB & TYLER LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/17/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE TO ADVIRSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

10/17/2013: NOTICE TO ADVIRSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1441(B) (DIVERSITY)

10/17/2013: NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1441(B) (DIVERSITY)

Minute Order

10/23/2013: Minute Order

ORDER FOR REMAND

10/25/2013: ORDER FOR REMAND

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; ETC.

11/22/2013: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; ETC.

DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; ETC.

11/22/2013: DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; ETC.

Minute Order

1/23/2014: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

1/30/2014: PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF JOSEPH F. MELUGIN

1/30/2014: PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF JOSEPH F. MELUGIN

UNOPPOSED APPLICATION OF LAY H. HENDERSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

1/30/2014: UNOPPOSED APPLICATION OF LAY H. HENDERSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2/3/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

2/6/2014: REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

2/6/2014: REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

OPPOSITION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

2/7/2014: OPPOSITION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS? REPLY PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE

2/7/2014: SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS? REPLY PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE

Minute Order

2/13/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/7/2014: Minute Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2016
  • Order-Protective (QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Stipulation (RE QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE CONDITIONAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Order (RE STIPULATION TO ESTABLISH QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND APPOINT SETTLEMENT FUND ADMINISTRATOR ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Stipulation Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Order (STIPULATED ORDER RE NEW TRIAL DATE AND RELATED ORDERRE NEW ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Stipulation (RE NEW TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Application-Pro Hac Vice (RENEWAL JAMES F. MURDICA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (AT FEBRUARY 11, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2013
  • Demurrer (TO PLTFS' COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Motion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL MINUTES-GENERAL FROM US DISTRICT COURT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Notice (TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons ( Johnson & Johnson Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical R es Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutica ls) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons ( McKesson Corporation ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less