This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 23:35:56 (UTC).

KENNETH PETERSON ETAL VS. DAVID M SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CORP.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2010 KENNETH PETERSON ETAL filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against DAVID M SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ALLAN J. GOODMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8364

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PETERSON KENNETH

PETERSON KRISTINA

Cross Defendants and Defendants

TOM CAMPBELL INSTALLATIONS

AIR-AL INC.

CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

GALVEZ GLASS

D. SCOTT

DAVID M SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

SCOTT D. AND MELONY R. JORENSON PTR

SCOTT D. & MELONY R. JORENSON PTR

SCOTT & MELONY JORENSON

G.T. WILLIAMS CONSTRUCTION INC.

MOZUR INC. DBA ROOF INTEGRITY

RBH INSULATION INC.

BENCHMARK BUILDERS SHOWROOM INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

PORTER SANDBLASTING

JB NEW CONSTRUCTION INC.

B.M. PLUMBING SERVICE

HIGH RISE TILE

DAVID M SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

STONE PRO

SCOTT & MELONY JORENSON

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDLEY MICHAEL I.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

PEGAN & FRASER

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

HANGER STEINBERG SHARPIRO & ASH

RYAN MICHAEL J.

RYAN NORMAN ESQ.

SCHNEIDER ESQ. ALLISON C.

BAKER KEENER & NAHRA

WATERS MCCLUSKEY& BOEHLE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KENNETH PETERSON (Plaintiff); KRISTINA PETERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by DAVID M SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION (Legacy Party); DAVID M. SHIRLEY (Legacy Party); SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CO. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by DAVID M SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by KENNETH PETERSON (Plaintiff); KRISTINA PETERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
239 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by DAVID M SHIRLEY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION (Legacy Party); DAVID M. SHIRLEY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketDemurrer (TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OR POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPORT THEREOF ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketMotion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • DocketNotice; Filed by KENNETH PETERSON (Plaintiff); KRISTINA PETERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KENNETH PETERSON (Plaintiff); KRISTINA PETERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KENNETH PETERSON (Plaintiff); KRISTINA PETERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KENNETH PETERSON (Plaintiff); KRISTINA PETERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIR AL INC C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU CE is a litigant

Latest cases where MOZUR INC. is a litigant