This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 10:51:22 (UTC).

KELTERITE CORP. VS IMPERIAL PAVING COMPANY INC.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 KELTERITE CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against IMPERIAL PAVING COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5728

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELTERITE CORPORATION A CALIF CORPORATION

Defendants

IMPERIAL PAVING COMPANY CORP A CORP.

IRG DOWNEY A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PCCP IRG DOWNEY A LIMITED LIABILITY COMP.

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY A

LYLE PARKS JR. CONSTRUCTION A CA.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVIRIAN & SHINMOTO PROFESSIONAL CORP.

Defendant Attorney

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2016
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by LYLE PARKS, JR. CONSTRUCTION, a Ca. (Defendant); HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KELTERITE CORPORATION a Calif corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (W/PREJ AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KELTERITE CORPORATION a Calif corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE TO DEBPORAH ARMS, PERSON IN CHARGE ON 09/09/16 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by KELTERITE CORPORATION a Calif corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by KELTERITE CORPORATION a Calif corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less