This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2019 at 19:52:01 (UTC).

KELLY FUDGE VS USC VERDUGO HILLS HOSPITAL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 KELLY FUDGE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against USC VERDUGO HILLS HOSPITAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3206

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FUDGE KELLY

KELLY FUDGE AN INDIVIDUAL

KELLY FUDGE AN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

PARKS KERRI S. M.D.

SUTTON PATRICK M. M.D.

USC VERDUGO HILLS HOSPITAL LLC

KERRI S. PARKS M.D.

PATRICK M. SUTTON M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MCNICHOLAS & MCNICHOLAS

MCNICHOLAS & MCNICHOLAS LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KJAR JAMES J. ESQ.

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARDORD STOCKALPER

SCHMID & VOILES

STOCKALPER REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARDORD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/14/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

1/14/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Proof of Service

2/19/2014: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/25/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M.D. TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/19/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M.D. TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M .D. TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MEDICAL BATTERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBIT

3/19/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M .D. TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MEDICAL BATTERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBIT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/22/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/30/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANT, PATRICK M. SUTTON, M.D.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

7/30/2014: DEFENDANT, PATRICK M. SUTTON, M.D.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION RE TRIAL ATTORNEY

7/30/2014: DECLARATION RE TRIAL ATTORNEY

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

10/31/2014: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT KERRI S PARKS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MEDICAL BATTERY

10/31/2014: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT KERRI S PARKS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MEDICAL BATTERY

REPLY OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M.D. TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

11/6/2014: REPLY OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M.D. TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

REPLY OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M.D. TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MEDICAL BATTERY

11/6/2014: REPLY OF DEFENDANT KERRI S. PARKS, M.D. TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MEDICAL BATTERY

Minute Order

11/14/2014: Minute Order

RULING RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

11/14/2014: RULING RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

NOTICE OF RULING

12/12/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • at 10:30 AM in Department A; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by an Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Partial Dismissal; Filed by an Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Notice; Filed by an Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by an Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by M.D. Kerri S. Parks (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons (served on Kerri S. Parks, M.D. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Proof of Service (SUMS ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by an Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff); Kelly Fudge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.