This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 17:36:46 (UTC).

KEITH COLLEA ET AL VS SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2013 KEITH COLLEA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4298

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

COLLEA KEITH

COLLEA KIM

Defendants and Respondents

CHILDS TRACEY M.D.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MAISTER ANTHONY M.D

SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF NEIL G. MACMILLAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KJAR JAMES J. ESQ.

TOMLINSON RODNEY G. ESQ.

MAEDER VINCENT A.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

3/29/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS -

3/29/2013: SUMMONS -

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

10/16/2013: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/16/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

10/16/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

10/21/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

10/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF REAONAB1E DILIGENCE

10/21/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF REAONAB1E DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

10/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, TRACEY R. CHILDS, M.D., TO COMPLAINT

10/31/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, TRACEY R. CHILDS, M.D., TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

11/8/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SANTA MONICA SURGICAL PARTNERS, LLC DBA SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

11/8/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SANTA MONICA SURGICAL PARTNERS, LLC DBA SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/13/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/14/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

6/27/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice, entire action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT ANTHONY MAISTER, M.D., ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • DocketReceipt (JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC LLC RUDY E. GRIMALDO- ADMISISTRATOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAEDER VINCENT A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KJAR JAMES JORGEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOMLINSON RODNEY G.