This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2019 at 21:25:42 (UTC).

KEITH CHUANG VS. ALBERT CHANG

Case Summary

On 09/25/2012 KEITH CHUANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALBERT CHANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART, C. EDWARD SIMPSON and DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0205

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHUANG ANNE

CHUANG JIM Y.

CHUANG KEITH

KEITH CHUANG

Defendants

CHANG & COTE LLP

CHANG ALBERT

TSAI WILLIAM

WILLIAM LAI

JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP

LAI WILLIAM

Other

WILLIAM B. DECLERCQ ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE BUSINESS LEGAL GROUP

THE HOLMES LAW FIRM

RUSSELL M. FRANDSEN ESQ

Defendant Attorney

JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP

 

Court Documents

FIRST AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF NONSUIT SIGNED BY THE HON. DONNA F. GOLDSTEIN

8/5/2014: FIRST AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF NONSUIT SIGNED BY THE HON. DONNA F. GOLDSTEIN

NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXHIBITS

2/4/2015: NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXHIBITS

REMITTITUR

2/26/2016: REMITTITUR

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Remittitur filed (REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 2/22/16 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt (AUGMENTATION ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Notice (NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
204 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2012
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by ALBERT CHANG (Defendant); WILLIAM TSAI (Defendant); CHANG & COTE, LLP (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by KEITH CHUANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by KEITH CHUANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by KEITH CHUANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by KEITH CHUANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Complaint; Filed by KEITH CHUANG (Plaintiff); Keith Chuang (Plaintiff); ANNE CHUANG (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACK & MAYBAUM LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where CHANG & COTE LLP. is a litigant