This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 21:59:16 (UTC).

KAYLENE BROUWER VS LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/13/2009 KAYLENE BROUWER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN, FALCONE, DEWEY L., MCKNEW, THOMAS I., JR. and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4710

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

FALCONE, DEWEY L.

MCKNEW, THOMAS I., JR.

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Defendants

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT

TAKACS LINDA

GARAND LYNN

ARTZ MELANIE

Minor

BROUWER KAYLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIBEAUT MAHAN & BRISCOE

Minor Attorney

ROBERTS LAW FIRM THE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2011
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department C, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by KAYLENE BROUWER (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); LINDA TAKACS (Defendant); LYNN GARAND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department W; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (Minor's Compromise; Petition is granted) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department W, Falcone, Dewey L., Presiding; Minor's Compromise - Petition is granted

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointng GAL (NAMING KAREN BROUWER GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF KAYLENE BROUWER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointing GAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketComplaint Filed-No Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC is a litigant