This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 09:08:20 (UTC).

KATHY NORRIS VS. SMART & FINAL INC.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 KATHY NORRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMART FINAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8851

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORRIS KATHY

Defendants

SMART & FINAL INC.

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARE & PETROFF LLP

Defendant Attorney

CLANCEY CLIFFORD A.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/17/2013: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

4/17/2013: Unknown

VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/17/2013: VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/19/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/24/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY SMART & FINAL INC. FOR AN ORDER DEEMING ALL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO RE

6/18/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY SMART & FINAL INC. FOR AN ORDER DEEMING ALL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO RE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SMART & FINAL INC.TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN

6/18/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SMART & FINAL INC.TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SMART & FINAL INC.TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, AND REQUEST FOR MONET

6/18/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SMART & FINAL INC.TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, AND REQUEST FOR MONET

DEFENDANT, SMART & FINAL INC.?S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION OFF CALENDAR

7/26/2013: DEFENDANT, SMART & FINAL INC.?S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION OFF CALENDAR

MINUTE ORDER

7/29/2013: MINUTE ORDER

Unknown

8/12/2013: Unknown

Minute Order

8/22/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

7/28/2014: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/30/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

8/1/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/8/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (complaint w/prej ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Notice of Status Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Notice (OF TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESP. TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROG., DEMAND FOR PROD. OF DOCS AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION OFF CAL. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Motion to Compel (PLTFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE, ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Motion (FOR AN ORDER DEEMING ALL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED, OR IN THE ALT., ON ORDER COMPELLING PLTFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Motion to Compel (PLTFF KATHY NORRIS TO PROVIDE RESPONSES AND DOCS TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS, SET NO. ONE, ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY DEPOSIT OF $150.00 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less