Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 22:04:24 (UTC).

KATHERINE ONG, ET-AL VS ABC UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2012 KATHERINE ONG, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABC UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, MARGARET M. BERNAL, RAUL A. SAHAGUN and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1613

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MARGARET M. BERNAL

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Defendants

ABC UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

ADUSUMALLI MR. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

ADUSUMALLI MRS. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

ADUSUMALLI PRASAD

ADUSUMALLI URMILA L.

ADUSUMALLI MRS. ERRONEOUSLY SUED

ADUSUMALLI MR. ERRONEOUSLY SUED

Minor

ONG KATHERINE

Guardian Ad Litem

ONG BEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDSON FAIR & COHEN

DOUMANIAN & ASSOCIATES

Minor Attorney

MATHEW & GEORGE

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ETC.

5/3/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ETC.

Minute Order -

7/9/2013: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FRANK LEAL ELEMENTARY SCHOOL TO PRODUCE RECORDS OF ASHKARA ADUSUMALLI PURSUANT TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS; ETC

8/5/2013: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FRANK LEAL ELEMENTARY SCHOOL TO PRODUCE RECORDS OF ASHKARA ADUSUMALLI PURSUANT TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS; ETC

PLAINTIFF?S COMPENDIUM OF DISCOVERY AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FRANK C. LEAL ELEMENTARY SCHOOL TO PRODUCE RECORDS OF ASHKARA ADUSUMALLI IN RESPONSE TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCT

8/5/2013: PLAINTIFF?S COMPENDIUM OF DISCOVERY AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FRANK C. LEAL ELEMENTARY SCHOOL TO PRODUCE RECORDS OF ASHKARA ADUSUMALLI IN RESPONSE TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCT

I.X PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SHORTEN TIME ON A MOTION TO COMPEL TILE I)EPOS[IION OF KATHERINE ONC AND BEN ONG

8/27/2013: I.X PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SHORTEN TIME ON A MOTION TO COMPEL TILE I)EPOS[IION OF KATHERINE ONC AND BEN ONG

Minute Order -

8/27/2013: Minute Order -

RULING RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FRANK LEAL ELEMENTARY SCHOOL TO PRODUCE RECORDS OF ASHKARA ADUSUMALLI PURSUANT TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

9/4/2013: RULING RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FRANK LEAL ELEMENTARY SCHOOL TO PRODUCE RECORDS OF ASHKARA ADUSUMALLI PURSUANT TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN, AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL THERETO

9/26/2013: MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN, AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL THERETO

DEFENDANTS PRASAD ADUSUMALLI AND URNILA ADUSUMALLI?S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT ABC UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG, AND CHRISTINA TRAN AND MOT

10/2/2013: DEFENDANTS PRASAD ADUSUMALLI AND URNILA ADUSUMALLI?S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT ABC UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG, AND CHRISTINA TRAN AND MOT

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE FLEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN, AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL THERETO; DF.CLARAI?ION OF MAZYAR MAZAREI

10/7/2013: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE FLEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN, AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL THERETO; DF.CLARAI?ION OF MAZYAR MAZAREI

DEFENDANT?S REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN

10/15/2013: DEFENDANT?S REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN

DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN

10/15/2013: DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN

DEFENDANT?S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION MAZYAR MAZAREK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN

10/15/2013: DEFENDANT?S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION MAZYAR MAZAREK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF KATHERINE ONG, BEN ONG AND CHRISTINA TRAN

Minute Order -

10/21/2013: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/23/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

DECLARATION OF MAZYAR H. MAZAREI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR MINOR?S COMPROMISE

4/18/2014: DECLARATION OF MAZYAR H. MAZAREI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR MINOR?S COMPROMISE

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

4/18/2014: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

6/12/2014: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Osc Re Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketOrder; Filed by BEN ONG (Legacy Party); KATHERINE ONG (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketOrder (APPROVING: COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION, MINOR ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketEXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketPetition for Comp Minor's Claim (*** EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE **** ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MAZYAR H. MAZAREI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR MINORS COMPROMISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MAZYAR H. MAZAREI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketPetition for Comp Minor's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (erroneously sued MR. ADUSUMALLI naming PRASAD ADUSUMALLI ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (erroneously sued as MRS ADUSUMALLI naming URMILA L. ADUSUMALLI ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointng GAL (NAMING GUARDIAN AD LITEM: BEN ONG FOR KATHERINE ONG ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed-No Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant