This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2016 at 01:08:13 (UTC).

KARO KARAPETYAN VS PACIFIC WEST MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 09/21/2009 KARO KARAPETYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACIFIC WEST MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINTO, R. BRUCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6831

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINTO, R. BRUCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KARAPETYAN KARO

TERVARTANYAN KNARIK

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC

PAVEL ZHORNITSKY

HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES

ETZ CONSTRUCTION INC

PACIFIC WEST MANAGEMENT

STIMSON AVE INDUSTRY LLC

ZHORNITSKY PAVEL

AP ELECTRIC AND PAVEL ZHORNITSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AGHABEGIAN ALAN ESQ.

SALLE WILLIAM F.

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON ERIC G.

FREDERICK J. ALAN LAW OFFICES OF

SCHICK MALCOLM D. ESQ.`

Cross Defendant Attorney

JACOBSON JERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2011
  • Notice (of Court's Dism of Case ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • Ord of Disml with prejudice (COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (Cross-complaint by ETZ Construction, Inc ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • Notice of Hearing Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • Notice (of Settlement ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • Notice (of Withdrawal of MSJ ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • Notice ( to take off msj ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • Declaration Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2010
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (3X ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC WEST MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES is a litigant