Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 15:15:31 (UTC).

KARLA CARDENAS VS DONALD JERVIS, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2012 KARLA CARDENAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DONALD JERVIS, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL S. MURPHY, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, HOWARD L. HALM and RALPH W. DAU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1023

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL S. MURPHY

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

HOWARD L. HALM

RALPH W. DAU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CARDENAS KARLA

Defendants, Respondents and Trustees

HERNANDEZ CODY

JERVIS DONALD

JERVIS PINKEY

JERVIS PROPERTY SERVICE INC.

JERVIS DONALD AS TRUSTEE OF THE JERVIS

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

JERVIS PINKEY AS TRUSTEE OF THE JERVIS

Others

RYAN LAW

FOX ROBERT P.

Not Classified By Court

GEORGE ROBERT K. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HINMAN JOHN

HANNING & SACCHETTO LLP

RYAN ANDREW T.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PROCTER II JAMES N.

PROCTER & SHYER LLP

WALKER ROBERT A. LAW OFFICE

LAW RYAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT

3/21/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; AND ORDER

12/6/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; AND ORDER

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

11/5/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION T0 CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/22/2014: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION T0 CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

STIPULATION TO BIFURCATE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AT TRIAL AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

9/30/2015: STIPULATION TO BIFURCATE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AT TRIAL AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

PLAINTIFF KARLA CARDENAS'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE SURVEILLANE VIDEOS OR PHOTOGRAPHS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOHN S. HINMAN; EXHI

10/2/2015: PLAINTIFF KARLA CARDENAS'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE SURVEILLANE VIDEOS OR PHOTOGRAPHS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOHN S. HINMAN; EXHI

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY RE: INSURANCE OR INSURANCE COVERAGE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/6/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY RE: INSURANCE OR INSURANCE COVERAGE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. S FOR AN ORDER PROHIBITING THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS FROM OFFERING ANY ARGUMENTS SUGGESTING THAT REPAIRMAN OR INDEPENDENT CONTRACTORS HIRE

11/4/2015: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. S FOR AN ORDER PROHIBITING THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS FROM OFFERING ANY ARGUMENTS SUGGESTING THAT REPAIRMAN OR INDEPENDENT CONTRACTORS HIRE

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING COUNSEL FROM PUBLISHING, REFERENCING, OR ADMITTING CERTAIN MEDICAL RECORDS

11/4/2015: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING COUNSEL FROM PUBLISHING, REFERENCING, OR ADMITTING CERTAIN MEDICAL RECORDS

Minute Order -

11/12/2015: Minute Order -

OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO MOTION IN LIMINES NOS. 3-5 RE BRAD AVRIT?S TESTIMONY

11/12/2015: OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO MOTION IN LIMINES NOS. 3-5 RE BRAD AVRIT?S TESTIMONY

STIPULATION, RECEIPT AND ORDER RE RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS

11/20/2015: STIPULATION, RECEIPT AND ORDER RE RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/20/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY -

12/7/2015: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY -

NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

12/11/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

12/18/2015: MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

12/23/2015: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF T.J. STEPHENS

1/8/2016: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF T.J. STEPHENS

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; (Motion to Strike; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 57; Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
323 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by KARLA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by KARLA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by KARLA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by KARLA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by KARLA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JERVIS PROPERTY SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROCTER JAMES N. II ESQ.