This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2022 at 20:21:47 (UTC).

KARL MURILLO, OSCAE MURILLO VS RICHARD LEON JARQUIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2010 KARL MURILLO, OSCAE MURILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD LEON JARQUIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1689

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MURILLO OSCAR

MURILLO KARL

Defendants

UNITED CARRIERS INC.

US FREIGHT CARRIER INC

SINGH MAKHAN

JARQUIN RICARDO LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAVIDOW ROBERT MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

HAYES JOHN GARDNER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • Docket(Request-Dismissal); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (OSC-Dismissal; Continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; (Trial; Continued-Department dark) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference (Conference-Final Status; Continued-Department dark) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • DocketComplaint-Amended (1st); Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KARL MURILLO (Plaintiff); OSCAR MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less