This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 02:14:10 (UTC).

KARINA ABANTO ET AL VS THRESIAMMA MATHEW ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 KARINA ABANTO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THRESIAMMA MATHEW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0766

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ABANTO KARINA

UVAS RENATO

Defendants and Respondents

MATHEW THRESIAMMA

MATHEW TRACY

TRACY'S BOARDING CARE

REMY'S HT RN CARE LLC

REMY'S GARDEN INC. D

KC HOME CARE

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

REMY'S GARDEN INC.

CARE TRACY'S BOARDING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MASTIN LAW FIRM

ROSA KWONG LAW OFFICE OF

FIRM MASTIN LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MICHAEL P. RUBIN & ASSOCIATES

MICHAEL P. RUBIN & ASSOCIATES INC.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: I) FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE IN VIOLATION OF CAL L4BOR CODE, ? 1194, IWC WAGE ORBER 11050; ETC

5/31/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: I) FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE IN VIOLATION OF CAL L4BOR CODE, ? 1194, IWC WAGE ORBER 11050; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ETC.

7/8/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ETC.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/14/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS THRESIAMMA MATHEW'S,KC HOME CARE'S, REMY'S HT RN CARE, LLC'S, TRACY'S BOARDING CARE'S, AND REMY'S GARDEN, INC.'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMP

8/18/2016: DEFENDANTS THRESIAMMA MATHEW'S,KC HOME CARE'S, REMY'S HT RN CARE, LLC'S, TRACY'S BOARDING CARE'S, AND REMY'S GARDEN, INC.'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMP

DEFENDANTS THRESIAMMA MATHEW'S, KC HOME CARE'S, REMY'S HT RN CARE, LLC'S, TRACY'S BOARDING CARE'S, AND REMY'S GARDEN, INC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; M

8/18/2016: DEFENDANTS THRESIAMMA MATHEW'S, KC HOME CARE'S, REMY'S HT RN CARE, LLC'S, TRACY'S BOARDING CARE'S, AND REMY'S GARDEN, INC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; M

THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) RENATO UVAS-FAILURE TO PAY MAINIMUM WAGE IN VIOLATION OF CAL LABOR CODE 1194, IWC WAGE ORDER 11050; ETC

2/17/2017: THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) RENATO UVAS-FAILURE TO PAY MAINIMUM WAGE IN VIOLATION OF CAL LABOR CODE 1194, IWC WAGE ORDER 11050; ETC

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS RENATO UVAS AND KARINA ABANTO FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SELLING A HEARING ON MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER C.C.P. SEC. 473; ETC.

4/3/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS RENATO UVAS AND KARINA ABANTO FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SELLING A HEARING ON MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER C.C.P. SEC. 473; ETC.

Minute Order

4/5/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE: OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON C.C.P.SEC. 473 MOTION FOR RELIEF

4/6/2017: NOTICE: OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON C.C.P.SEC. 473 MOTION FOR RELIEF

Proof of Service

5/4/2017: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF ROSA KWONG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF THEIR MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER C.C.P. SEC. 473; ETC

6/8/2017: DECLARATION OF ROSA KWONG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF THEIR MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER C.C.P. SEC. 473; ETC

Proof of Service

6/16/2017: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE

7/6/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED: MAY 24, 2017 ORDER DEEMING CASE NUMBER BC639954 AS NOT RELATED

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED: MAY 24, 2017 ORDER DEEMING CASE NUMBER BC639954 AS NOT RELATED

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

7/12/2017: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

ORDER

7/26/2017: ORDER

NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

10/16/2017: NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Karina Abanto (Plaintiff); Renato Uvas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • APPELLANT''S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by Karina Abanto (Plaintiff); Renato Uvas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Karina Abanto (Plaintiff); Renato Uvas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Karina Abanto (Plaintiff); Renato Uvas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Karina Abanto (Plaintiff); Renato Uvas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Karina Abanto (Plaintiff); Renato Uvas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: I) FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE IN VIOLATION OF CAL L4BOR CODE, 1194, IWC WAGE ORBER 11050; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less