This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:13:32 (UTC).

KARIM BELKEBIR VS TWIST BAKE SHOP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2016 KARIM BELKEBIR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TWIST BAKE SHOP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4580

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BELKEBIR KARIM

Defendants and Respondents

BERCOVITCH JOELLE

TWIST BAKE SHOP INC

DOE SUPERVISOR

DOES 1-100

ALAIN MALKA

MALKA ALAIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

REISNER & KING LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BERNARD STEPHEN ESQ.

NICHOLSON GUY C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/12/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

3/12/2019: Ex Parte Application

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (J) ACTUAL/PERCEIVED DISABILITY HARASSMENT, VIOLATION OF CAL. GOV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC.

7/26/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (J) ACTUAL/PERCEIVED DISABILITY HARASSMENT, VIOLATION OF CAL. GOV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

8/4/2016: Unknown

Unknown

9/6/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/6/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order

9/19/2016: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/19/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

10/19/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/8/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/3/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/23/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

12/5/2017: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FROM JANUARY 23, 2018 DUE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL BEING ENGAGED IN ANOTHER TRIAL IN ORANGE COUNTY ON JANUARY 22, 2018

12/5/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FROM JANUARY 23, 2018 DUE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL BEING ENGAGED IN ANOTHER TRIAL IN ORANGE COUNTY ON JANUARY 22, 2018

Minute Order

12/13/2017: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES FROM APRIL 16, 2019 TO ON OR ABOUT SEPTEMBER 23, 2019, TO FACILITATE A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; REQUEST FOR ORDER TO ATTEND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES FROM APRIL 16, 2019 TO ON OR ABOUT SEPTEMBER 23, 2019, TO FACILITATE A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; REQUEST FOR ORDER TO ATTEND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Karim Belkebir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Order (ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES FROM APRIL 16, 2019 TO ON OR ABOUT SEPTEMBER 23, 2019, TO FACILITATE A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; REQUEST FOR ORDER TO ATTEND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENC); Filed by Karim Belkebir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 61; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Karim Belkebir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Karim Belkebir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES:. (1) ACTUAL/PERCEIVED DISABILITY HARASSMENT, VIOLATION OF CAL. GOV. CODE 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC624580    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains to attorney Adam Reisner of the firm Reisner & King, counsel for plaintiff Karim Belkebir. The motion complies with the above requirements.

Attorney Adam Reisner of the firm Reisner & King’s Motion to be Releived as Counsel for Plaintiff Karim Belkebir is GRANTED.