This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 21:43:43 (UTC).

KAREN SNOOK ET AL VS THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATIONAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/27/2012 KAREN SNOOK filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6370

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SAAVEDRA KRYSTINA

SNOOK KAREN

Defendants and Respondents

GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION INC. THE

LAKS YAEL

WEINER JAY

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KINAGA LAW FIRM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BATHAEE SADAF

FLORES MICHELLE LEE ESQ.

WHITTINGTON JEFFREY S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

11/27/2012: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL BREAKS (LABOR CODE ? 226.7(A) & 512); ETC

11/27/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL BREAKS (LABOR CODE ? 226.7(A) & 512); ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/28/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/28/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/10/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/10/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

1/3/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ORDER RE: RELATED CASES

1/10/2013: NOTICE OF ORDER RE: RELATED CASES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/11/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DEFENDANT THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/16/2013: DEFENDANT THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

1/28/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS JAY WEINER AND YAEL LAKS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

2/11/2013: DEFENDANTS JAY WEINER AND YAEL LAKS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/19/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DECLARATION OF JOE SEOANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION?S NOTICE OF LX P4RTE APPLICATION AND EXP4RTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER ALLOWING THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION TO FILE

2/28/2013: DECLARATION OF JOE SEOANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION?S NOTICE OF LX P4RTE APPLICATION AND EXP4RTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER ALLOWING THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION TO FILE

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ALLOW FILING UNDER SEAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY STAY; DECLARATION OF PATRICIA KINAGA IN SUPPO

2/28/2013: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ALLOW FILING UNDER SEAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY STAY; DECLARATION OF PATRICIA KINAGA IN SUPPO

DEFENDANT, THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION?S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICA11ON FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER ALLOWING THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION TO FILE ITS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORAR

2/28/2013: DEFENDANT, THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION?S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICA11ON FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER ALLOWING THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION TO FILE ITS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORAR

DECLARATION OF SADAF BATHAEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION?S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORI)ER ALLOWING THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION TO

2/28/2013: DECLARATION OF SADAF BATHAEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION?S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORI)ER ALLOWING THE GENTLE BARN FOUNDATION TO

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketStipulation (JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER IN SUPPORT THEREOF ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • DocketStipulation (JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUED THE MAY 15, 2013, STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER THEREON ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv (ALL DEFENDANTS) - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order Re: Related Cases (R/W BC49747) - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GENTLE BARN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BATHAEE SADAF

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORES MICHELLE LEE ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITTINGTON JEFFREY S. ESQ.