This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 17:43:04 (UTC).

KAREN MCGEE ET AL VS WARWICK PARTNERS LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2013 KAREN MCGEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WARWICK PARTNERS LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7028

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JONES CARL

JORDAN NICHOLE

MCGEE KAREN

Defendants and Respondents

21ST CENTURY CONSTRUCTION LLC

A1 SHB ENVIRONMENTAL INC.

ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

ARGUERTA JOSE

BAUMANN KURT

DOES 1-250

EMP III INC.

FUERZA VENTURE GROUP INC.

KR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC._

LEON & SON'S PLUMBING INC.

MASON SCOTT

MENDOZA CONTRACTING INC

REVELES JUAN MANUEL

SURFACE TOP QUALITY

TREADSTONE COMPANIES THE

TREADSTONE HOUSING LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EMP III INC.

LEON & SON'S PLUMBING INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

A1 SHB ENVIRONMENTAL INC.

AAA LEAD CONSULTANTS & INSPECTIONS INC.

KR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC._

MENDOZA CONTRACTING INC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF NICHOLAS HEIMAN

LAW OFFICES OF PETER GOLDSTEIN

DORDICK GARY A. ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TORSNEY PATRICK ESQ.

LAW OFFICE OF BAKER & ASSOCIATES

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR LAW O/O

BISTLINE GREGORY D. ESQ.

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

FIELDSLAW APC

LYNBERG & WATKINS LAW OFFICES OF

GABRIELSALOMONS LLP

HAHN BRISTLINE & ASSOCIATES

CROSS EDWARD H. ESQ.

KENNICK MICHAEL T. ESQ.

GORDON & REES LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR LAW O/O

BISTLINE GREGORY D. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

 

Court Documents

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

1/13/2017: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/10/2014: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice

11/28/2016: Notice

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

1/13/2017: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2017: Notice of Ruling

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous)

11/28/2016: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

1/13/2017: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

1/13/2017: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MENDOZA CONTRACTING, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/10/2014: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MENDOZA CONTRACTING, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

12/7/2016: Notice of Ruling

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous)

11/28/2016: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Minute Order

11/6/2014: Minute Order

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

1/13/2017: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

1/13/2017: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Notice of Lodging

2/2/2017: Notice of Lodging

Notice

11/28/2016: Notice

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

2/6/2017: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

2/6/2017: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2016
  • Notice (OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDNATS, WARWICK PARTNERS, LP, TEADSOTNE HOUSING, LLC, EMP III, INC. DBA ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SCOTT MASON AND JOSE ARGUERTA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Report-Status (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other ((PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED) NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' KR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC'S DEMURRER/MOTION TO STRIKE AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE HEARD 9/11/15) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (RE DEFENDANTS' KR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC'S DEMURRER/MOTION TO STRIKE AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Report-Status (JOINT POSITION STATEMENT OF PARTIES RE DISPUTED NOTICE OF RULING FOLLOWING FURTHER SC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Answer (DEFENDANTS KR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. AND KURT BAUMANN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FILED ON JULY 10, 2015 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Report-Status (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Reply/Response (DEFENDANTS KR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC., AND KURT BAUMANN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2013
  • Notice (APPEARANCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Notice (complex fee paid ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Notice (payment of complex fee and first p apers ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Notice (OF APPEARANCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • Notice (APPEARANCE NO FEE PAID ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • Notice (complex fee ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Notice (RELATED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Order (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.