This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 02:44:21 (UTC).

KAREN KEELING VS. ACT 1 GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2015 KAREN KEELING filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ACT 1 GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5129

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KEELING KAREN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

APPLE ONE EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

ALL IN 1

HOWROYD GROUP OF COMPANIES THE

ACT 1 GROUP INC.

HOWROYD-WRIGHT EMPLOYMENT AGENCYDOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

COMMUNITY LAW GROUP LLC THE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KENNETH P. ROBERTS APLC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/2/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

2/14/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

6/6/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMACES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

12/18/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMACES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

SUMMONS

1/27/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/4/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/18/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/27/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/28/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

6/30/2016: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/29/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/12/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/13/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' ARBITRATION STATUS REPORT

2/3/2017: DEFENDANTS' ARBITRATION STATUS REPORT

PLAINTIFF'S POST ARBITRATION REPORT

2/6/2017: PLAINTIFF'S POST ARBITRATION REPORT

Minute Order

10/5/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

10/31/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • at 10:39 AM in Department 40; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Related Case) of 06/06/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Related Case) of 06/06/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Karen Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Notice of Related Case (Amended); Filed by Karen Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; (Conference-Binding Arb. Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; (Conference-Binding Arb. Status; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2016
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Karen Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMACES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Karen Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Karen Keeling (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC605129    Hearing Date: September 24, 2020    Dept: 40

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner/Defendant Howroyd-Wright Employment Agency, Inc.

OPPOSITION: None Submitted

Respondent and Plaintiff Karen Keeling (“Respondent”) filed a complaint against Petitioner and Defendant Howroyd-Wright Employment Agency, Inc., (“Petitioner”) alleging discrimination and harassment. On September 3, 2019, the JAMS arbitrator issued an award in Petitioner’s favor finding that Respondent had failed to meet her burden of proof as to her discrimination and harassment claims and Petitioner brings this motion to confirm that award.

A) Filing Requirements (Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.4):

CCP § 1285.4 states: “A petition under this chapter shall:

Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement. ¶ Set forth the names of the arbitrators. ¶ (c) Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.”

Petitioner has submitted a copy of the signed Employment Agreement which contains arbitration provisions, provided the name of the arbitrator, and attached a copy of the arbitrator’s award. (Decl., Kanooni, Exs. A, B.) Accordingly, Petitioner has satisfied section 1285.4.

B) Service of the Arbitration Award, Petition, and Notice of Hearing (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1283.6, 1290.4):

Code of Civil Procedure, section 1283.6 provides that “[t]he neutral arbitrator shall serve a signed copy of the award on each party to the arbitration personally or by registered or certified mail or as provided in the agreement.”

Code of Civil Procedure, section 1290.4 states, in pertinent part:

“(a) A copy of the petition and a written notice of the time and place of the hearing thereof and any other papers upon which the petition is based shall be served in the manner provided in the arbitration agreement for the service of such petition and notice.

On October 31, 2019, the parties received a signed copy of the arbitrator’s award. Plaintiff has served a copy of the petition and notice on Respondent’s counsel.

C) Timeliness of Petition (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1288, 1288.4):

A party may seek a court judgment confirming an arbitration award by filing and serving a petition at least 10 days, but no more than four years after the award is served on Respondents and Petitioners. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1288, 1288.4.)

The petition was served more than 10 days after the award was served on the parties. Accordingly, Petitioner has satisfied sections 1288 and 1288.4.

Conclusion: Petitioner’s Petition to Confirm the Arbitration Award is GRANTED

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APPLE ONE EMPLOYMENT SERVICES LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ACT 1 GROUP INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWROYD-WRIGHT EMPLOYMENT AGENCY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant