This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 01:37:51 (UTC).

KAREN J. MAX VS. VICKI L. YAWN

Case Summary

On 10/06/2011 KAREN J MAX filed an Other lawsuit against VICKI L YAWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAN A. PLUIM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8190

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAN A. PLUIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAX KAREN J.

J. MAX KAREN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

VITAGANZA HEALTH FOODS LLC

YAWN JOHNIE

YAWN VICKI L.

JAMISON & ASSOCIATES

L. YAWN VICKI

Not Classified By Court

MINASSIAN ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIX & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

JAMISON & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department P, JAN A. PLUIM, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (CASE SETTLED) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department P, JAN A. PLUIM, Presiding; Final Status Conference (OFF CALENDAR- CASE SETTLEDMEDIATION COMPLETION DATE 9-25-12) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by MAX KAREN J. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Agreement (Full)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR - Agreement (Full)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by MAX KAREN J. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by YAWN VICKI L. (Defendant); JOHNIE YAWN (Defendant); VITAGANZA HEALTH FOODS, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MAX KAREN J. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MAX KAREN J. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MAX KAREN J. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MAX KAREN J. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamison & Associates, PLLC is a litigant