This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 11:54:24 (UTC).

KAREN CICERO VS JOHN MARTIN, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 03/27/2015 KAREN CICERO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN MARTIN, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3972

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CICERO KAREN

PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC.

NARTEY KOFI

FINCH JOEL

PALISADES INVESTMENT TRUST

FINE JODY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MARTIN JOHN

MARTIN NATASHA

JOEL FINCH GENERAL CONTRACTOR

AGENCY. THE

BHH AFFILIATES LLC

PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HORNER & ASSOCIATES

GALLO LISA A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DIBAEI AMIR SAM

OBRAND MICHAEL G.

Cross Defendant Attorney

OBRAND MICHAEL FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

5/26/2016: Legacy Document

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

6/6/2016: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order

9/29/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/19/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

11/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

6/17/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

4/3/2017: Minute Order

Legacy Document

5/19/2016: Legacy Document

Notice of Ruling

10/12/2016: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/27/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document

5/27/2016: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/19/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document

5/26/2016: Legacy Document

Minute Order

6/2/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/5/2016: Minute Order

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Jury Trial (by declaraation on Cross-Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial by declaration on Cross-Complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Declaration (of Karen Cicero)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Appearance Case Review (re ruling on trial by declaration) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re ruling on trial by declaration) of 05/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re ruling on trial by declaration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Appearance Case Review (re ruling on trial by declaration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re ruling on trial by declaration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by John Martin (Cross-Complainant); Natasha Martin (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
294 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by John Martin (Defendant); Natasha Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by John Martin (Defendant); Natasha Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by John Martin (Defendant); Natasha Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Karen Cicero (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Karen Cicero (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.