Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 10:11:15 (UTC).

KAMAL BILAL VS ANTONE NINO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2013 KAMAL BILAL filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against ANTONE NINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT H. O'BRIEN, TERRY A. GREEN and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2207

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

TERRY A. GREEN

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BILAL KAMAL

Defendants and Respondents

AAA GAS INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

NASRIN SHAKERI NINO

NINO ANTONE

WESTCO PETROLEUM DISTRIBUTORS INC.

WESTCO PETROLEUM INC.

ANTONE NINO AND NASRIN SHAKERI NINO A PARTNERSHIP

SIEGEL JEFFREY ADMININSTRATOR OF THE

NINO NASRIN SHAKERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

UNGAR ROBERT M.

UNGAR ROBERT M. ESQ.

UNGAR ROBERT MICHAEL ESQ.

BILAL KAMAL A.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SCAPA ROBERT B. ESQ.

SCAPA ROBERT BENJAMIN ESQ.

STEVENSON W. TODD

SEGURA JACOB NESSIM ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DEEMING CASES NOT RELATED

3/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DEEMING CASES NOT RELATED

Substitution of Attorney

4/9/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

7/3/2019: Answer

Reply - REPLY JOINT RESPONSE OF SETTLING PARTIES TO SIEGEL'S OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

8/16/2019: Reply - REPLY JOINT RESPONSE OF SETTLING PARTIES TO SIEGEL'S OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Request for Judicial Notice

8/21/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Order - ORDER ENFORCING AWARD OF COSTS ON APPEAL

10/7/2019: Order - ORDER ENFORCING AWARD OF COSTS ON APPEAL

Request for Dismissal

12/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

1/7/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE); HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIO...)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE); HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIO...)

COMILAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, CORPORATE DISSOLUTION, AND APPOINTMENT OF A PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR. I. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTIES; ETC

9/23/2013: COMILAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, CORPORATE DISSOLUTION, AND APPOINTMENT OF A PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR. I. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTIES; ETC

Minute Order -

10/17/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/25/2013: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDKNTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ADDITIONAL CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR.

11/1/2013: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDKNTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ADDITIONAL CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO APPOINT PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR

12/6/2013: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO APPOINT PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR

ANSWER TO VERIFIED FIRST \MENDED COMPLAINT

2/26/2014: ANSWER TO VERIFIED FIRST \MENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE, AND EXTENDING THE RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. UNGAR

3/20/2015: STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE, AND EXTENDING THE RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. UNGAR

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES 1. RREACH OF WRITTEN CNNTRACT; ETC.

8/1/2016: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES 1. RREACH OF WRITTEN CNNTRACT; ETC.

NOTICE OF LIEN (ATTACHMENT-ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

12/21/2017: NOTICE OF LIEN (ATTACHMENT-ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Antone Nino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Kamal Bilal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Kamal Bilal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
276 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketMotion for an Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. UNGAR RE EX PARTE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO APPOINT PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND 4UTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KAMAL BILAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-10-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kamal Bilal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketCOMILAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, CORPORATE DISSOLUTION, AND APPOINTMENT OF A PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR. I. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTIES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kamal Bilal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC522207    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: January 10, 2020

Case Name: Bilal v. Siegel, et al.

Case No.: BC522207

Motion: Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment

Moving Party: Kamal Bilal, Nasrin Shakeri Nino, and Antone Nino and Nasrin Shakeri Nino, a Partnership

Opposing Party: Jeffrey Siegel, Personal Representative and

Administrator of the Estate of Antone Nino, deceased

Tentative Ruling: The Motion is granted.


Kamal Bilal, Nasrin Shakeri Nino, and Antone Nino and Nasrin Shakeri Nino, a Partnership jointly move for the Court to enter judgment pursuant to their settlement.

Jeffrey Siegel, Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Antone Nino, deceased, opposes the Motion. But, Siegel lacks standing because he has been dismissed from this action.

As a valid, written stipulation exists in which the parties have requested that the Court enter judgment pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. § 664.6, the Motion is granted.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTCO PETROLEUM DISTRIBUTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA GAS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTCO PETROLEUM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCAPA ROBERT BENJAMIN