This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2016 at 17:14:45 (UTC).

KALSBEEK, KEVIN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/09/2011 KALSBEEK, KEVIN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L. and LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7420

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KALSBEEK ROZANNE

Not Classified By Court

SUPERIOR COURT

Decedent

KALSBEEK KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORAVEC LINDA K. ESQ

MORAVEC HENRY J. III ESQ

MOONEY F. BENTLEY JR. ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/12/2012

TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2012

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2012

Receipt (F.BENTLEY MOONEY, JR. ATTORNEY FOR EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF KEVIN KA LSBEEK, DECEASED Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2012

Order - Approving Account (Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2012

Supplement (TO REPORT OF EXECUTOR ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT, ETC. Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2012

Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2012

Accounting (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 04/12/2012 Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2012

Inventory & Appraisal ($349,430.50 Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2012

Certificate (Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
05/25/2011

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed by: Attorney for Executor Executor: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2011

Request (Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2011

Letters (Full Authority NO BOND Filed by: Attorney for Executor Issued To:: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2011

Order - Appointing Personal Representative (- WITH FULL AUTHORITY Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2011

Supplement (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2011

Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2011

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2011

Proof of Publication (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2011

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2011

Petition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 04/07/2011 Filed By: Kalsbeek, Rozanne, Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Linda K., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less