This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 15:41:34 (UTC).

JUSTICE INVESTMENTS, LLC, ET AL VS. CAPITAL ONE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 JUSTICE INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3846

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEST HORACE J. JR.

JUSTICE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

CAPITAL ONE N.A.

MTC FINANCIAL INC.

DOES 1-50

TRUSTEE CORPS

AAE PROPERTIES LLC

AAE PROPERTIES LLC AS DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNINGER SHIRLEY A.

Defendant Attorneys

REYNOLDS RICHARD JOSEPH

NUSSBAUM LANE M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department W; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department W; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Motion-Stay; Continued-Department dark) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by AAE PROPERTIES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Designation of Record on Appeal; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by AAE PROPERTIES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department Q; (Application-Ex Parte; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department Q; (Application-Ex Parte; Granted) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Order; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Motion to Consolidate; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by MTC Financial Inc. (Defendant); Trustee Corps (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Justice Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); Horace J. Jr. West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MTC FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRUSTEE CORPS is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant