This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:38:22 (UTC).

JUNG HIE PARK VS VIVIENNE ONYENEKE

Case Summary

On 11/30/2016 JUNG HIE PARK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VIVIENNE ONYENEKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2395

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Petitioners

PARK JUNG HIE

ONYENEKE VIVIENTE

ONYENEKE VIVIENNE

DOES 1-100

Defendants and Respondents

ONYENEKE VIVIENNE

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD D. HOFFMAN

HINDIN ROBERT MARC ESQ.

MONTY LAUREEN ANN ESQ.

HOFFMAN RICHARD DALE ESQ.

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HINDIN ROBERT MARC ESQ.

MORRIS ANTOINETTE DANIELLE ESQ.

HINDIN KYLE JORDAN ESQ.

DIAMOND PETER KEVIN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

1/4/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Unknown

1/29/2018: Unknown

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

3/26/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

RULING RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE BY PLAINTIFF VIVIENNE ONYENEKE

5/17/2018: RULING RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE BY PLAINTIFF VIVIENNE ONYENEKE

NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATED CASES

5/25/2018: NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATED CASES

Minute Order

9/17/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

9/18/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Ex Parte Application

11/15/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

3/7/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/7/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

11/30/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/30/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

1/24/2017: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/3/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF RULING RE RELATED CASES

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF RULING RE RELATED CASES

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

6/15/2017: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

9/12/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial pursuant to Stipulation of all Parties) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (- Final Status Conference; - Hearing on Ex Parte Application ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial pursuant to Stipulation of all Parties); Filed by Vivienne Onyeneke (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Vivienne Onyeneke (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Ex Parte Application (to continue trial pursuant to stipulation of all parties); Filed by Vivienne Onyeneke (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Jung Hie Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Jung Hie Park (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Vivienne Onyeneke (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Vivienne Onyeneke (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Viviente Onyeneke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jung Hie Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC642395    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 29

Defendant Jung Hie Park’s Motion to Bifurcate Liability and Damages at Trial is DENIED.

Code of Civil Procedure section 598 provides that the Court may order that the trial of any issue shall precede the trial of any other issue “when the convenience of witnesses, the ends of justice, or the economy and efficiency of handling the litigation would be promoted thereby.” Section 1048(b) provides: “The court, in further of convenience or to avoid prejudice, or when separate trials will be conducive to expedition and economy, may order a separate trial on any cause of action . . . or of any separate issue or any number of causes of action or issues . . . .” Here, the parties have stipulated to separate trials on liability and damages.

Despite the stipulation, the Court concludes that judicial economy will not be served by ordering separate trials on liability and damages. In assigning personal injury cases for trial, Department 1 acts as a master calendar court. In the master calendar context, ordering bifurcation presents logistical challenges for the Court and results in judicial inefficiency. From the Court’s perspective, it is more efficient to try liability and damages in a single trial, even when the liability issues are relatively simple and damages issues complex. The parties have not presented any facts that would outweigh the inefficiency and logistical burden that bifurcation would impose on the Court. The motion is therefore denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.