This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:25:14 (UTC).

JULIO GARCES OTERO ET AL VS ROBIN LOMBARDO ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/04/2016 JULIO GARCES OTERO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBIN LOMBARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9154

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

OTERO JULIO GARCES

GARCES MATTHEW

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

LOMBARDO ROBIN

LOMBARDO JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EMRANI JACOB ESQ.

EMRANI JACOB

GRANDY JAMES LAWTON

Defendant Attorneys

MAHLSTEDT JOY ESQ.

DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

ORDER CONTINUING FSC AND TRIAL

2/26/2018: ORDER CONTINUING FSC AND TRIAL

Unknown

2/27/2018: Unknown

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

5/4/2018: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #8 TO PRECLUDE POLICE OFFICER FROM OFFERING OPINIONS ON CAUSATION; ETC.

7/12/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #8 TO PRECLUDE POLICE OFFICER FROM OFFERING OPINIONS ON CAUSATION; ETC.

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE; ETC.

7/12/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE; ETC.

DEFENDANTS CROSS COMPLAINANTS ROBIN LOMBARDO AND JENNIFER LOMBARDO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE;AND ETC.

7/19/2018: DEFENDANTS CROSS COMPLAINANTS ROBIN LOMBARDO AND JENNIFER LOMBARDO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE;AND ETC.

Ex Parte Application

3/13/2019: Ex Parte Application

Stipulation

3/14/2019: Stipulation

Association of Attorney

5/17/2019: Association of Attorney

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/4/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY AND TOTAL INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

4/15/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY AND TOTAL INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/15/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/15/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

5/4/2016: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

6/12/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

6/20/2017: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

6/28/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

NOTICE OF ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/29/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Robin Lombardo (Defendant); Jennifer Lombardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ASSOCIATED CASES); Filed by Julio Garces Otero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to order consolidation of related cases and continue the trial date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to order consolidation of related cases and continue trial); Filed by Julio Garces Otero (Plaintiff); Matthew Garces (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF JULIO GARCES OTERO AND MATTHEW GARCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY AND TOTAL INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Julio Garces Otero (Plaintiff); Matthew Garces (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC609154    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JULIO GARCES OTERO, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ROBIN LOMBARDO ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC609154

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 14, 2020

Defendants move to continue trial, contending Plaintiff has a pending uninsured motorists’ claim that will likely resolve within 90-120 days, and the parties to this action can likely resolve this action without trial once the UIM claim is resolved.  The parties have agreed to continue trial to 6/16/20 in light of the pending resolution of the UIM claim.

The Court finds resolution of the UIM claim is not directly relevant to the claims made in this action, but understands that Plaintiff’s receipt of proceeds from that claim could meaningfully inform settlement discussions in this action.  In light of the strong policy in favor of settlement prior to trial, the Court finds good cause to continue the trial date.  The 1/29/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to 6/16/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  The Court sets an FSC for 6/02/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3.  All discovery and expert cut-off dates are based on the new trial date. 

Defendants are ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.