This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 11:41:35 (UTC).

JULIEN BARGAIN ET AL VS JOSE ARTURO PEREZ

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 JULIEN BARGAIN filed an Other lawsuit against JOSE ARTURO PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9997

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BARGAIN JULIEN

CRAPANZANO SANDRINE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

SANDOVAL MICHAEL

PEREZ JOSE ARTURO

ROJAS FRANCIS

Respondents and Cross Defendants

PEREZ JOSE ARTURO

ROJAS FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LODMER ZACHARY H.

Defendant Attorney

DOMINGUEZ DARIN R. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

COHAN KATHERINE R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/2/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT, ETC

8/8/2014: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT, ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/12/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

9/16/2014: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

Minute Order

10/23/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE AFTER HEARING

10/24/2014: NOTICE AFTER HEARING

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/9/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/9/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

3/26/2015: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ETC.

3/26/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED WITNESS LIST

3/27/2015: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED WITNESS LIST

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

3/27/2015: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/27/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

5/22/2015: Minute Order

Proof of Service

6/7/2016: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT

6/23/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT

DECLARATION OF ZACHARY H. LODMER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

6/23/2016: DECLARATION OF ZACHARY H. LODMER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF RULING

8/24/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2015
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (SEE ATTACHMENT ON DISMISSAL ) Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney ((2) ) Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Notice Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Answer to Complaint (ANS TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1=MICHAEL SANDOVAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Cross-complaint Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHAN KATHERINE REBECCA