This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 16:05:41 (UTC).

JULIE SU VS LUXURY LINERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2016 JULIE SU filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LUXURY LINERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4247

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SU JULIE CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMI-

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 10

LEGEND LIMOUSINE & CHARTER

LUXURY LINERS INC.

LEGEND TRANSPORTATION

MITCHELL BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BELL DAVID LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 98.6 AND 1102.5

6/28/2016: COMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 98.6 AND 1102.5

SUMMONS

6/28/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/6/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/6/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

9/8/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

10/18/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

10/26/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/14/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/23/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/3/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/10/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/10/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

5/4/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/1/2017: Minute Order

BRIEF SUMFIARY OF CASE IN SUIPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/5/2017: BRIEF SUMFIARY OF CASE IN SUIPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF DAVID BELL IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ETC

7/5/2017: DECLARATION OF DAVID BELL IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ETC

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

7/5/2017: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

7/5/2017: Minute Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID BELL IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • BRIEF SUMFIARY OF CASE IN SUIPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Su, Julie , California State Labor Commi- (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 98.6 AND 1102.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SU JULIE CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMIS- is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL, DAVID LAWRENCE