Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 07:09:56 (UTC).

JULIE SU VS DAVID J PASTERNAK ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 JULIE SU filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DAVID J PASTERNAK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ERNEST HIROSHIGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2375

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SU JULIE

Defendants and Respondents

ABDELMALEK HANY S.

DOES 1-10

MALEK HANY S.

PASTERNAK DAVID J.

MALEK HANY

Cross Plaintiff

CHOICE PROVIDERS MEDICAL GROUP

Other

PASTERNAK DAVID J. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BELL DAVID LAWRENCE

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON JEFFERY W. ESQ.

SCHWARTZ GARY N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

6/23/2014: Legacy Document - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

COMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS98.6 AND 1102.5

10/28/2011: COMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS98.6 AND 1102.5

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/27/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

5/24/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

5/24/2012: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

Minute Order -

7/9/2012: Minute Order -

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANT HANY MALEK

11/9/2012: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANT HANY MALEK

Minute Order -

11/9/2012: Minute Order -

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HANY S. MALEK TO CROSSCOMPLAINANT CHOICE PROVIDERS MEDICAL GROUP?S UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/11/2013: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HANY S. MALEK TO CROSSCOMPLAINANT CHOICE PROVIDERS MEDICAL GROUP?S UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/4/2013: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

2/8/2013: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/2/2013: NOTICE OF INTENT TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

PLAINTIFF?S BANKRUPTCY STATUS REPORT

4/25/2014: PLAINTIFF?S BANKRUPTCY STATUS REPORT

Minute Order -

4/30/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

4/5/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

5/6/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

7/7/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/13/2017: Minute Order -

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-12-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-10-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-03-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Julie Su (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS98.6 AND 1102.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julie Su (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less