This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 14:44:45 (UTC).

JULIE SU ET AL VS CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY

Case Summary

On 06/27/2013 JULIE SU filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and RONALD M. SOHIGIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0945

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER

CALIFORNIA STATE OF

SU JULIE

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY

DOES 1 - 10

EXCEPTIONAL HOME HEALTH CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAVID BELL

SMITH MICHAEL L.

BELL DAVID

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GARY WYKIDAL

WYKIDAL GARY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

6/27/2013: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/30/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/30/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND PLAINTIFF?S STAFF COUNSEL

8/13/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND PLAINTIFF?S STAFF COUNSEL

PROOF OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/13/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/25/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/25/2013: ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION, ETC

10/29/2013: ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION, ETC

ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION

10/29/2013: ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order -

10/29/2013: Minute Order -

STIPULATION BY PARTIES TO WITHDRAW JURY DEMAND

11/21/2013: STIPULATION BY PARTIES TO WITHDRAW JURY DEMAND

Minute Order -

12/3/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING AT OSC RE SEVERANCE OF JURY AND NON- JURY CAUSES OF ACTION

12/3/2013: NOTICE OF RULING AT OSC RE SEVERANCE OF JURY AND NON- JURY CAUSES OF ACTION

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/20/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/27/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order -

1/20/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/25/2015: Minute Order -

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND PLAINTIFFS STAFF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Julie Su (Plaintiff); California State Labor Commissioner, (Plaintiff); California, State of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Julie Su (Plaintiff); California State Labor Commissioner, (Plaintiff); California, State of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 98.6 AND 1102.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julie Su (Plaintiff); California State Labor Commissioner, (Plaintiff); California, State of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA EXCEPTIONAL HOME HEALTH CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE OF is a litigant