This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 23:44:59 (UTC).

JUDITH DOLAN ET AL VS CAL VISTA HOME LOANS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2012 JUDITH DOLAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CAL VISTA HOME LOANS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7954

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CONDON ESTHER

DOLAN JUDITH

FEIGENBAUM HOWARD

FEIGENBAUM HOWARD AND BARBARA

HAYS PHILIP AND ANNE

JOHNSON SHERYL

KARSCH DANIEL N.

LOCKE ALLAN

MATHES SHARON

MOCHAN ROBIN

RADER LEWIS AND CAROL

Defendants and Respondents

A & I SERVICE

ARROWOOD RAYMOND B.

BUILDERS CONTROL SERVICE CO.

CAL VISTA HOME LOANS INC.

CAL VISTA MORTGAGE COMPANY

CASTILLO DAVID

CIDET INC.

COCHRAN JOSEPH E.

DELGADO ELIDIA

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HAGEMANN MICHAEL K.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ARMSTRONG JR. WACY ESQ.

FU JOHN ESQ.

NAGGER JOSHUA D.

RIVA KEVIN R.

ROSS ROBERT ESQ.

SCHILLER MICHAEL I. ESQ.

SOSA CARLOS E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Witness List

1/7/2016: Witness List

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

5/30/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTIONS FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; REQUEST FOR COSTS; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. HAGEMANN; PROOF OF SERVICE

7/5/2012: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTIONS FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; REQUEST FOR COSTS; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. HAGEMANN; PROOF OF SERVICE

ORDER

8/30/2012: ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/21/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CIVIL DEPOSIT

12/11/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PROOF OF SERVICE

12/13/2012: NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PROOF OF SERVICE

MINUTE ORDER

3/27/2013: MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order -

9/13/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/9/2015: Minute Order -

JUDGMENT

6/3/2015: JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

10/7/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

10/7/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

ORDER

10/30/2015: ORDER

Minute Order -

10/30/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/14/2016: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

2/29/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION

3/1/2016: NOTICE OF TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION

257 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 2:51 PM in Department 42; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((NON APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RETURN OF EXHIBITS) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (NON APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RETURN OF EXHIBITS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketREMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNtc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

    Read MoreRead Less
513 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (THIRTY-ONE CAUSES OF ACTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Judith Dolan (Plaintiff); Sharon Mathes (Plaintiff); Robin Mochan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (TIIIRTY-ONE CAUSES OF ACTION) JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUILDERS CONTROL SERVICE CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL VISTA HOME LOANS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL VISTA MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naggar, Joshua D