This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2019 at 10:11:31 (UTC).

JUDITH BROWN WILLIAMS VS. ALL VALLEY PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 JUDITH BROWN WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALL VALLEY PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6148

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS JUDITH BROWN

STATE FARM INSURANCE

WILLIAMS JUDITH BROWN DBA STATE FARM INSURANCE

Defendant

ALL VALLEY PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

TONY FORBERG ESQ.

MULVIHILL CYNTHIA COULTER

HOLTZ CRAIG A. LAW OFFICE OF

EUM DAVID INN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Jury Instructions

8/9/2019: Jury Instructions

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 OF 9

8/12/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 OF 9

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-03-02 00:00:00

3/2/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-03-02 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-05-17 00:00:00

5/17/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-05-17 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-12-08 00:00:00

12/8/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-12-08 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-08 00:00:00

6/8/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-08 00:00:00

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

6/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Reply - Reply Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Appear and Testify at Deposition

1/16/2019: Reply - Reply Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Appear and Testify at Deposition

Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Appear and Testify at her Deposition

1/3/2019: Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Appear and Testify at her Deposition

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

1/23/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Deposition

12/14/2018: Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Deposition

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued

12/16/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/7/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - civil deposit

4/4/2017: Notice - civil deposit

Case Management Statement

5/3/2017: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/8/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling -

9/12/2018: Notice of Ruling -

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Judith Brown Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 9 of 9); Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 8 of 9); Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 7 of 9); Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 6 of 9); Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 4 of 9); Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 5 of 9); Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by All Valley Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketRequest For Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by State Farm Insurance (Plaintiff); Judith Brown Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-03-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by State Farm Insurance (Plaintiff); Judith Brown Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by State Farm Insurance (Plaintiff); Judith Brown Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less