This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 11:35:45 (UTC).

JUANA JUDITH TERREZASK, ET-AL VS IVAN BARRETT, M.D., ET-AL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2012 JUANA JUDITH TERREZASK, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against IVAN BARRETT, M D , ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1627

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERREZASK JUANA JUDITH

MARTINEZ NANCY

RAMIREZ ELSA

LOPEZ MARTIN

Defendants

BARRETT IVAN M.D.

DOWRAD MEDICAL GROUP

BARRETT IVAN M.D. A PROFESSIONAL CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RONALD E. HARRINGTON INC.

Defendant Attorney

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/12/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

4/26/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2013
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by JUANA JUDITH TERREZASK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JUANA JUDITH TERREZASK (Plaintiff); ELSA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); NANCY MARTINEZ (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prej. entire action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JUANA JUDITH TERREZASK (Plaintiff); ELSA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); NANCY MARTINEZ (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO IVAN BARRETT M.D. A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO DOWRAD MEDICAL GROUP ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO IVAN BARRETT M.D. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOWRAD MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant