This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 00:12:35 (UTC).

JUAN M POZO RUIZ VS ROADRUNNER PIZZA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2016 JUAN M POZO RUIZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ROADRUNNER PIZZA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6596

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RUIZ JUAN M POZO

Defendants and Respondents

FERDOWS FARNAD

SEDRAK ARMEN

DOES 1-100

A & A PIZZA INC

1 AMIGOS PIZZA INC

GOOD GUYS PIZZA INC

ROADRUNNER PIZZA INC

2 MUSKETEERS PIZZA INC

3 AMIGOS PIZZA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

VAN VLECK TURNER & ZALLER

ZALLER LAW GROUP PC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/28/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Petition

2/6/2018: Petition

Response

2/20/2018: Response

Stipulation

3/8/2018: Stipulation

Judgment

3/8/2018: Judgment

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF APPEAL

7/18/2016: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

7/20/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

8/12/2016: NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

Declaration

1/13/2017: Declaration

Opposition

1/13/2017: Opposition

Motion re:

1/20/2017: Motion re:

Other -

4/12/2017: Other -

Minute Order

4/27/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/1/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

6/22/2017: Minute Order

Other -

7/13/2017: Other -

Status Report

7/27/2017: Status Report

Status Report

8/10/2017: Status Report

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Message Board Posting case anywhere; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 311; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award (Petition Confirm Arbitration Award; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • -POSTING TO MESSAGE BOARD: Message Title: Future hearing date in Truss 8C640086

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Stipulation -STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BASED THEREON; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; AND SEVERING AND CLOSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Order; Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-02-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Juan M Pozo Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less