This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 21:27:59 (UTC).

JUAN LOPEZ VS SILVERCO ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 JUAN LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SILVERCO ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, LISA HART COLE and MAREN E. NELSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3738

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

LISA HART COLE

MAREN E. NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOPEZ JUAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

SILVERCO ENTERPRISES INC

Other

BRADLEY MARCUS J. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRADLEY MARCUS J. ESQ.

KHORSHIDI LAW FIRM APC

MARLIN & SALTZMAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SCALI LAW FIRM

FIRM SCALI LAW

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/4/2015: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE PROPER WAGE STATEMENTS (LAB. CODE SECTION 226); ETC

9/4/2015: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE PROPER WAGE STATEMENTS (LAB. CODE SECTION 226); ETC

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/4/2016: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/4/2016: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/6/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/6/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration

1/10/2017: Declaration

Declaration

1/10/2017: Declaration

Declaration

1/10/2017: Declaration

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

1/10/2017: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

Supplemental Declaration

2/10/2017: Supplemental Declaration

Supplemental Declaration

2/10/2017: Supplemental Declaration

Minute Order

2/24/2017: Minute Order

Order

2/24/2017: Order

Default Judgment

3/21/2017: Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

4/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Minute Order

11/29/2017: Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • Case File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Case File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 307; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF KELSEY E. SKEY WITH RESPECT TO DISBURSEMENT AND FINAL ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Juan Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Default Judgment FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2015
  • Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Silverco Enterprises, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Stipulation; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Juan Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 307; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juan Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE PROPER WAGE STATEMENTS (LAB. CODE SECTION 226); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Juan Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.