This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:48:46 (UTC).

J.S., A MINOR VS. FIRST LUTHERAN CHURCH, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2013 J S , A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FIRST LUTHERAN CHURCH, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7323

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.S. A MINOR

Defendants

DOLLISON LATONYA

HAMITER BEVERLY

JERNIGAN GIL

JERNIGAN PATRICIA

MIMS O. DENNIS

MINOR PERPETRATOR

MRS. K. PARKER

MS. COOPER

MS. MORRIS

MS. STEPHENS

PARENTS OF MINOR PERPETRATOR

WILLIAMS CYNTHIA

WITTE MARK

BRYANT VENETTA

LEGGETTE VICTORIA

Not Classified By Court

FIRST LUTHERAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT CENTER

FIRST LUTHERAN CHURCH

MS. BRYANT

MS. LEGGETTE

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWEN PATTERSON & OWEN

Defendant Attorneys

STEPHANIE S. BARIL

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS .

GREENE FIDLER & CHAPLAN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/29/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/11/2013: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

6/13/2013: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. INTCNTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

6/13/2013: PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. INTCNTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

Unknown

6/18/2013: Unknown

Unknown

6/19/2013: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/2/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/2/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/5/2013: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

7/5/2013: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/18/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/5/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney (4 FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Acknowlgmt of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • Notice ((4) NOTICES OF AKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AS TO DEFTS.-SEE ATTACHMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • Notice (OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (without prejudice as to punitive damages claim contained in the first cause of action of First Amended complaint with respect to First Lutheran Church, only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Summons Filed (FIRST AMENDED ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Summons Issued (FIRST AMENDED ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR J.S. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Application - misc (FOR J.S. GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice (CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.