This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2020 at 06:50:09 (UTC).

JRSL FAM 1 LLC VS COVINA PALMS CENTER LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2011 JRSL FAM 1 LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COVINA PALMS CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. BORENSTEIN, JOANNE O'DONNELL, HOLLY E. KENDIG, BARBARA A. MEIERS, EDWARD B. MORETON and ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8457

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

JOANNE O'DONNELL

HOLLY E. KENDIG

BARBARA A. MEIERS

EDWARD B. MORETON

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JRSL FAM 1 LLC

ULTIMATE ACTION LLC

Defendants

COVINA PALMS CENTER LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

FOX GERSON

KAMEN MICHAEL J.

Other

DONELL STEPHEN J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REISS SAUL ESQ.

ROSENBAUM MARK J.

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABKI

SAUL REISS PC

ROSENBAUM MARK J

Defendant Attorneys

BRAUNSTEIN GEORGE G. ESQ.

BUCHALTER NEMER A PC

SALISIAN/LEE LLP

APC BUCHALTER NEMER

LEVEN NEALE BENDER YOO & BRILL LLP

ARENT FOX LLP

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION LIEN

2/3/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION LIEN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RESCHEDULED HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 5/26/20) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RESCHEDULED HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 5/26/20) OF 04/17/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CHARGING ORDER AND FORECLOSURE; ETC

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CHARGING ORDER AND FORECLOSURE; ETC

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT -

3/22/2018: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT -

OATH OF RECEIVER

3/30/2011: OATH OF RECEIVER

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT GERSON FOX TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION APPOINTING RECEIVER

4/15/2011: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT GERSON FOX TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION APPOINTING RECEIVER

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR CONFIRMATION OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

4/19/2011: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR CONFIRMATION OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE RE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT COVINA PALMS CENTER. LLC

4/19/2011: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE RE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT COVINA PALMS CENTER. LLC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

6/13/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/1/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/18/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

NOTICE OF RULING AFTER STATUS CONFERENCE

11/28/2011: NOTICE OF RULING AFTER STATUS CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF JACK R. SCHARRINGHAUSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GERSON FOX?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING TILE AT1?ENDANCE AND TFSTIMONY OF AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFENDANT GERS

2/23/2012: DECLARATION OF JACK R. SCHARRINGHAUSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GERSON FOX?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING TILE AT1?ENDANCE AND TFSTIMONY OF AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFENDANT GERS

NOTICE OF RULING AFTER HEARING

4/2/2012: NOTICE OF RULING AFTER HEARING

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

3/11/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

REQUEST FOR REFUND

3/14/2013: REQUEST FOR REFUND

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR

4/24/2014: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

10/14/2015: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

217 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Ultimate Action, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Ultimate Action, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Ultimate Action, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (of entry of judgment or order); Filed by Ultimate Action, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (to extend judgment debtor examination lien) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketOrder (Motion to Extend Judgment Debtor Examination Lien); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to extend judgment debtor examina...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docketat 3:40 PM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Case Reassignment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Case Reassignment;) of 06/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
425 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketOATH OF RECEIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketEX PARTE ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER- RENTS, ISSUES, AND PROFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JRSL FAM 1, LLC (Plaintiff); Ultimate Action, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketUndertaking; Filed by Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketOath of Receiver; Filed by Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PROPOSED RECEIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPOINTMENT SHOULD NOT BE CONFIRMED AND DECLARATION OF PROPOSED RECEIVER, JAMES H DONELL, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC458457    Hearing Date: July 28, 2020    Dept: 26

IN ORDER TO IMPLEMENT PHYSICAL DISTANCING AND UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE, THE COURT STRONGLY ENCOURAGES ALL COUNSEL AND ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR NON-TRIAL AND NON-EVIDENTIARY MATTERS, INCLUDING THIS MOTION.

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 26

Ultimate action llc,

Plaintiff,

v.

covina palms center, llc,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC458457

Hearing Date: July 28, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to extend judgment debtor examination lien

On March 14, 2013, a money judgment was entered in favor of Ultimate Action LLC (“Creditor”) against judgment debtor Gerson Fox (“Debtor”) in the amount of $18,498,071.00 with a current balance of at least $10,000,000.00. (Rosenbaum Decl. ¶ 2.)

On January 3, 2018, an order to appear for a judgment debtor examination was issued for Debtor. (Rosenbaum Decl. ¶ 5, Ex. A.) “On January 11, 2018, the Debtor was served with the Order.” (Id. ¶ 6, Ex. B.) “Service of the order creates a lien on the personal property of the judgment debtor for a period of one year from the date of the order unless extended or sooner terminated by the court.” (CCP § 708.110(d).) On December 20, 2018, the court granted Creditor's motion to extend the lien created by service of the January 3, 2018 order to December 31, 2020. (Id. ¶ 11 Ex. C.) Over the past seven years, Creditor has recorded various liens such as “(1) recorded an abstract of judgment to create a lien on Debtor's real property, (2) filed a judgment lien with the California Secretary of State, (3) obtained an assignment order against certain third parties that may do business with Debtor, (4) obtained a charging order against Debtor's interest in a limited liability company, (5) foreclosed on Debtor's interest in real property and (6) filed liens in pending lawsuit(s) and bankruptcy case(s) in which Debtor may have or had an interest.” (Id. ¶ 14.) However, these liens do not reach all of Debtor’s nonexempt personal property such as Debtor’s interest in various bankruptcy proceedings and membership interests in multiple limited liability companies. (Id. ¶ 15.)

Debtor Gerald Fox states that, in lieu of appearing at an additional judgment debtor examination as he and his spouse are over 80 years of age, Debtor has agreed to extend the 708.110 Lien to December 31, 2022. (Fox Decl. ¶ 12.) “No other judgment creditors of me or my spouse have a currently levied assignment order or wage garnishment against us (there is one prior levy which is outstanding regarding some stock which is disputed).” (Fox Decl. ¶ 8.)

As there is no dispute as to the lien and good cause, Creditor’s motion to extend the Judgment Debtor Examination lien created on January 3, 2018 to December 31, 2022 is GRANTED

Moving Party is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: June 28, 2020 ___________________________

Elaine Lu

Judge of the Superior Court