Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:26:25 (UTC).

JPMC SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC VS ARMONDO V MAGDALENO ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 JPMC SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ARMONDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6980

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JPMC SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants and Respondents

MAGDALENO ARMONDO V.

EVERBANK S/B/M EVERHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY

ALLIANCE MORTGAGE COMPANY

MAGDALENO MARIE E.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HILLERY TERESA Y. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HAGER LAURIE R.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR CANCELLATION OF INSTRUMENT, EQUITABLE SUBROGATION, AND JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE OF EQUITABLE LIEN

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT FOR CANCELLATION OF INSTRUMENT, EQUITABLE SUBROGATION, AND JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE OF EQUITABLE LIEN

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

10/19/2016: NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

11/14/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

EVERBANK'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/2/2016: EVERBANK'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/13/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/27/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/26/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

2/10/2017: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Unknown

2/16/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

3/6/2017: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/5/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

9/13/2017: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Unknown

9/14/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

NOTICE 0F SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION

10/11/2017: NOTICE 0F SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION

Minute Order

11/15/2017: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 46; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 46; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 46; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • NOTICE 0F SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 46; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • EVERBANK'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Everbank S/B/M Everhome Mortgage Company (Defendant); Alliance Mortgage Company (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR CANCELLATION OF INSTRUMENT, EQUITABLE SUBROGATION, AND JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE OF EQUITABLE LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMC SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TERESA Y. HILLERY