This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 06:24:46 (UTC).

JOY OLAYIWOLA VS MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/23/2012 JOY OLAYIWOLA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN, GREGORY W. ALARCON, J. STEPHEN CZULEGER and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8749

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

GREGORY W. ALARCON

J. STEPHEN CZULEGER

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OLAYIWOLA JOY

Defendants and Respondents

DAUM SARAH

MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HANEY GLORIA DREDD LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION DOCUMENT

1/22/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION DOCUMENT

Other - - JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

1/22/2015: Other - - JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: (1) RETALIATION BASED ON DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE ? 12940(H)]; ETC

7/23/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: (1) RETALIATION BASED ON DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE ? 12940(H)]; ETC

SUMMONS -

7/23/2012: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/24/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/20/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/20/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF DEMURREE AND DEMURRER TO PLAJNTJFFS COMPLAINT

10/9/2012: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF DEMURREE AND DEMURRER TO PLAJNTJFFS COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/15/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/23/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/25/2012: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/25/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order -

10/29/2012: Minute Order -

FIRST ANENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: (1) RETALIATION BASED ON DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE ? 12940(H)]; (2) DISCRIMINATION BASED ON RACE, COLOR, NATIONAL ORIGIN [GOV. CODE ? 1290

2/5/2013: FIRST ANENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: (1) RETALIATION BASED ON DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE ? 12940(H)]; (2) DISCRIMINATION BASED ON RACE, COLOR, NATIONAL ORIGIN [GOV. CODE ? 1290

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT OFF-CALENDAR DUE TO FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/11/2013: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT OFF-CALENDAR DUE TO FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

2/13/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/8/2013: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

APPENDIX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/8/2013: APPENDIX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

356 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joy Olayiwola (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-09-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-08-31 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 3; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-08-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
758 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2012
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: (1) RETALIATION BASED ON DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE 12940(H)]; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joy Olayiwola (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.