Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 11:46:51 (UTC).

JOVAN CARRILLO VS ALFONSO JUAREZ, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 11/06/2012 JOVAN CARRILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALFONSO JUAREZ, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, GAIL FEUER, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, ROGER ITO, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2260

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

GAIL FEUER

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

ROGER ITO

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

CARRILLO JOVAN

REYNOSA LETICIA

Defendants

ISLAS ALFONSO

JUAREZ ALFONSO

OLVERA YAJAIRA G.

ALFONSO ISLAS

Minor

AMEZQUITA JAZMIN

Other

SCANDURA STEVEN P. LAW OFFICE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALAMATI SEAN F. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

WASSON DAVID B. ESQ.

SCANDURA STEVEN P. LAW OFFICE OF

 

Court Documents

RULING RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSSCOMPLAINT; AND NOTICE RE FUTURE CALENDAR DATES/TIMES RE FSC AND TRIAL

10/1/2013: RULING RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSSCOMPLAINT; AND NOTICE RE FUTURE CALENDAR DATES/TIMES RE FSC AND TRIAL

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/2/2013: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

12/12/2013: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES; ETC

12/30/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES; ETC

ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES

12/30/2013: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

1/6/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL PRE-TRIA.L DATES AND DEADLINES

3/6/2014: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL PRE-TRIA.L DATES AND DEADLINES

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

3/20/2014: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE HEAJUNG

3/20/2014: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE HEAJUNG

NOTICE OF RULING RE: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM AND ORDER

8/5/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM AND ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM LEXINGTON CHIROPRACTINC AND/OR ETC

8/20/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM LEXINGTON CHIROPRACTINC AND/OR ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION ANDMOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM KORNG DESIGN CORP.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; REQUEST FOR MONETAR

8/20/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION ANDMOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM KORNG DESIGN CORP.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; REQUEST FOR MONETAR

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM KORNG DESIGN CORP

9/12/2014: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM KORNG DESIGN CORP

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM LEXINGTON CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR ITS CORPORATE MANAGING OFFICE

9/12/2014: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM LEXINGTON CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR ITS CORPORATE MANAGING OFFICE

ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES

9/15/2014: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES

Minute Order -

9/15/2014: Minute Order -

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KIMBERLEY H. G. SAKAI IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/15/2014: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KIMBERLEY H. G. SAKAI IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 17,2014)

9/17/2014: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 17,2014)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALPER M/O 8/4/15) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JOVAN CARRILLO (Plaintiff); LETICIA REYNOSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; COUNSEL FOR X-C SIGNED OFF; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Application; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department C, Roger Ito, Presiding; Ex-Parte Application - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by JAZMIN AMEZQUITA (Legacy Party); JOVAN CARRILLO (Plaintiff); LETICIA REYNOSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by ALFONSO JUAREZ (Defendant); YAJAIRA G. OLVERA (Defendant); ISLAS ALFONSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketOpposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL DR. KREITENBERG TO REFUND EXPERT WITNESS FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (TO COMPEL DR. ARTHUR KREITENBURG, M.D., TO REFUND EXPERT WITNESS FEE ADVANCEMENT; ALTERNATIVELY AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING; MONETARY SANCTIONS; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO ALFONSO JUAREZ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO ALFONSO ISLAS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by JAZMIN AMEZQUITA (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointng GAL (Naming LETICIA REYNOSA as Guardian Ad Litem for JAZMIN AMEZQUITA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOVAN CARRILLO (Plaintiff); LETICIA REYNOSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed-No Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCANDURA STEVEN PAUL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASSON, DAVID B.