This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 00:03:27 (UTC).

JOSUE IVAN PERALTA ET AL VS SAN GABRIEL TEMPORARY STAFFING S

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 JOSUE IVAN PERALTA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SAN GABRIEL TEMPORARY STAFFING S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0681

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

PERALTA JOSUE IVAN

STORSETH GREGORY

Defendants and Respondents

LABORMAX STAFFING

SAN GABRIEL TEMPORARY STAFFING SERVICES

DOES 1 TO 10

SAN GABRIEL TEMPORARY STAFFING SERVICES DBA LABORMAX STAFFING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MATHEW ABRAHAM ESQ.

PETRONELLI & HO LLP

MATHEW ABRAHAM P ESQ.

PETRONELLI CHRISTIAN J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BARBER JOHN LONGYEAR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/12/2018: Minute Order

Other -

4/3/2018: Other -

Minute Order

4/10/2018: Minute Order

Status Report

11/6/2018: Status Report

Unknown

11/9/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/9/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

12/28/2018: Stipulation and Order

Declaration

2/22/2019: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/22/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

2/22/2019: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

Declaration

2/22/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/11/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

6/3/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

6/3/2019: Unknown

SUMMONS

11/10/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT (1) !A!URE TO PAY WAGES (LABOR CODE 204); ETC

11/10/2016: COMPLAINT (1) !A!URE TO PAY WAGES (LABOR CODE 204); ETC

Status Report

11/30/2016: Status Report

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling of the Motion for Preliminary Approval) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Declaration (of Sang J. Park in support of Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Josue Ivan Peralta (Plaintiff); Gregory Storseth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2016
  • Notice NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Josue Ivan Peralta (Plaintiff); Gregory Storseth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 310; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-11-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Status Report INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT (1) !A!URE TO PAY WAGES (LABOR CODE 204); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Josue Ivan Peralta (Plaintiff); Gregory Storseth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC640681    Hearing Date: March 03, 2020    Dept: 14

Josue Ivan Peralta, et al. v. San Gabriel Temporary Staffing Services, LLC, et al.

MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND INCENTIVE PAYMENT

TENTATIVE RULING

GRANT final approval, finding that the settlement is fair, reasonable, and adequate.

Award/approve the following: (1) $216,666.67 for attorney fees to Class Counsel, Mathew & George, and Petronelli Law Group, PC; (2) $10,109.94 for attorney costs to Class Counsel; (3) $13,000 for enhancement awards to the class representatives [$6500 x 2] [reduced from request for $10k x 2]; (4) $15,000 for claims administration costs to CPT Group, Inc.; and (5) $7,500 (75% of $10,000 PAGA penalty) to the LWDA.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Gabriel Temporary Staffing Services LLC is a litigant