This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 10:01:07 (UTC).

JOSHUA SADIGH VS EUGENE RAPAPORT ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2011 JOSHUA SADIGH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against EUGENE RAPAPORT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ERNEST HIROSHIGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2782

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADIGH JOSHUA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

RAPAPORT EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELFMAN LARRY A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

4/20/2012: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/19/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

3/13/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/27/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS -

1/4/2012: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

11/2/2011: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joshua Sadigh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF LARRY A. HELFMAN - LARRY HELFMAN