This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 03:53:36 (UTC).

JOSEPH PRECHTL VS. NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2011 JOSEPH PRECHTL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2150

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRECHTL JOSEPH

Defendants

CHRISTINA LOUISE MATTS M.D.

DIGNITY HEALTH

NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION

NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON B. ELLIOT ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW L.

Defendant Attorneys

LAW BRANDMEYER + PACKER LLP

TAYLOR BLESSEY LLP.

Other Attorneys

LLP. TAYLOR BLESSEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JOSEPH PRECHTL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by JOSEPH PRECHTL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department F49; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Removed ADR-Other) -

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JOSEPH PRECHTL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION (Defendant); NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Legacy Party); DIGNITY HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Legacy Party); DIGNITY HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JOSEPH PRECHTL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by JOSEPH PRECHTL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JOSEPH PRECHTL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JOSEPH PRECHTL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant