This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 23:04:47 (UTC).

JOSEPH DOMINGUEZ VS CHWC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/07/2014 JOSEPH DOMINGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHWC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8526

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DOMINGUEZ JOSEPH

Defendants and Respondents

AZI ENTERTAINMENT

AZINIAN ROBER

CHWC INC.

CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIGTCLUB

DOES 1 TO 50

MILLER JESSE

RTS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

AZINIAN ROBERT

JONATHAN PANAPA AFATI (DOE 1)

5 DIAMOND PROTECTION INC. (DOE II)

5 DIAMOND PROTECTION INC. DOE II

JONATHAN PANAPA AFATI DOE 1

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HALEH SHEKARCHIAN

Defendant Attorney

CHAPMAN ARTHUR J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/7/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

3/7/2014: SUMMONS -

Proof of Service -

6/18/2014: Proof of Service -

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

7/13/2015: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

RPO9F ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION1DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY .DEPARMIENT 9? 92, 939D

7/13/2015: RPO9F ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION1DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY .DEPARMIENT 9? 92, 939D

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

10/5/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

10/5/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/27/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Proof of Service -

11/5/2015: Proof of Service -

Summons on Cross Complaint -

2/17/2016: Summons on Cross Complaint -

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROBERT AZINIAN AND AZI ENTERTAINMENT, INC. DBA CRAZY HORSE FOR IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEVINITY; CONTRIBUTION AND PARTIAL INDEMNITY: AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

2/17/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROBERT AZINIAN AND AZI ENTERTAINMENT, INC. DBA CRAZY HORSE FOR IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEVINITY; CONTRIBUTION AND PARTIAL INDEMNITY: AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] - PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

2/19/2016: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] - PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

PROOF OF SERVICE STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

3/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Proof of Service -

3/17/2016: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/13/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

4/14/2016: NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/20/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

9/22/2016: Minute Order -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketNotice (OF COURT ORDER DISMISSING CROSS-COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDER DISMISSING CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Robert Azinian (Defendant); Azi Entertainment (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 97, Benny C. Osorio, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (WHY CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/16SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSEDNO APPEARANCENO RESPONSE TO OSC) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 97, Benny C. Osorio, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (*NOS FILED 4/13/16* PLTF OFC TO*HAVE GIVEN NTC MARIANNE 3102712121/ PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joseph Dominguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketProof-Personal Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketProof-Personal Service; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph Dominguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIGTCLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where AZI ENTERTAINMENT INC A CORPORATION DBA CRAZY HORSE is a litigant

Latest cases where C.H.W.C. INC A CORPORATION DBA CRAZY HORSE is a litigant

Latest cases where 5 DIAMOND PROTECTION INC. is a litigant