This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 16:41:45 (UTC).

JOSEFINA L. GONZALEZ VS. CITY OF COMPTON, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2012 JOSEFINA L GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF COMPTON, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ADR NEUTRAL and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6034

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ADR NEUTRAL

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ JOSEFINA L.

GONZALEZ JOSEPHINA L.

Defendants

COMPTON CITY OF

DOES 1

DOES 1-25

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

ZINSER JERRY C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LT PACIFIC LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant Attorney

COMPTON CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE .

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

4/22/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/23/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/16/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal ( ENTIRE ACTION W/PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Stipulation (AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Receipt (STIP TO CONTINUE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Notice (OF PLNTFF'S MTN IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO ALLEGED SPOUSAL ABUSE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Notice-Mediation Hrg Date Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Notice-Assignmt-Medtr-Amended Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2012
  • Notice-Mediation Hrg Date Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.