This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 02:32:30 (UTC).

JOSE VEGA VS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/07/2015 JOSE VEGA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8618

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VEGA GLORIA

VEGA JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

BANK OF NEW YORK THE

DOES 1-50

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

COMMUNITY LAW CENTER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GOULDING DANIEL J. ESQ.

RIBAR GWEN H. ESQ.

ADVIENTO MARVIN BELO

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for

11/26/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM MULLINS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

5/22/2015: DECLARATION OF WILLIAM MULLINS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/22/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO STOP THE SALE

8/21/2015: OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO STOP THE SALE

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/19/2015: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

11/24/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/7/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/22/2016: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DFFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQ

10/21/2016: DFFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQ

Minute Order

10/28/2016: Minute Order

RULING RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION MOTION

10/28/2016: RULING RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION MOTION

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/31/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AS TO DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO'S 333 DISCOVERY REQUESTS; REQUESTS FOR $3,510.00 SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO'S AND IT ATTORNEY OF RECORD, MR. MARVIN ADVIENTO; MEMO

11/18/2016: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION AS TO DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO'S 333 DISCOVERY REQUESTS; REQUESTS FOR $3,510.00 SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO'S AND IT ATTORNEY OF RECORD, MR. MARVIN ADVIENTO; MEMO

Minute Order

12/13/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

12/21/2016: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DECLARATION OF MARVIN B. ADVIENTO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/22/2016: DECLARATION OF MARVIN B. ADVIENTO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

2/9/2017: ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/24/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • Request (for Refund); Filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (Defendant); Bank of New York Mellon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Request for Refund) of 11/26/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Request for Refund)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 51; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-06-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-06-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Vega (Plaintiff); Gloria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Vega (Plaintiff); Gloria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • PLAINTIFF VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: I. LACK OF TITLE AND STANDING (C C. 2924(A)(6)) (WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Jose Vega (Plaintiff); Gloria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

O o0 ~J N N - W N

=O\ Wh A WN = DO VvV NN WD~ O

Superior Court of California

WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK, LLP ountv of Los Angeles Gwen H. Ribar, Esq. (SBN 188024) | 0CT 812016

Taline M. Keshishian, Esq. (SBN 233828)

4665 MacArthur Court, Suite 200 - | Sherri R. Ca ive Officer/Clerk Newport Beach, CA 92660 By# Deputy Tel: (949) 477-5050; Fax: (949) 608-9142 unya Bolden - Attorneys for Defendants

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE, ON BEHALF OF THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2007-OA4, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH

CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-OA4 SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

JOSE VEGA and GLORIA VEGA, ) CASE NO.: BC568618 ) Plaintiff, ) [Assigned for All Purposes to the Honorable

y Michael J. Raphael, Department 51] V.

‘ ) NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS’

SELECT-PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.; ) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, O IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, fka The ) ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO Bank of New York, as Trustee, on behalf of

) , The Registered Holders of Alternative Loan ) EB?\I«I;EEF&% SECOND AMENDED

Trust 2007-OA4, Mortgage Pass Through

Certificates Series 2007-OA4; QUALITY ) Hearing: | . POAN SERVICE CQRP-; and DOES 1-50, ) Date: October 28, 2016 [Reserved] inclusive, : ) Time: 9:00 a.m.

) Dept.: 51 Defendants. ) Reservation ID: 160422122789 )

) Comp. filed: January 7, 2015

) FAC filed: May 20, 2015

) SAC filed: December 3, 2015 ) Trial Date: December 13, 2016

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,