Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 19:18:52 (UTC).

JOSE SANCHEZ VS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 JOSE SANCHEZ filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8810

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SANCHEZ JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

DOE 1

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK

DOE 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JP LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PIPER DAVID D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/11/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/11/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA RE CONVEYANCE COMPANY

3/8/2013: DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA RE CONVEYANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JP MORGAN CHASE'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/4/2013: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JP MORGAN CHASE'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFPS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JP MORGAN C14ASE?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

4/4/2013: PLAINTIFPS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JP MORGAN C14ASE?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

DEFENDANTS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

4/12/2013: DEFENDANTS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER

4/12/2013: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/15/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/22/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/4/2013: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER

7/9/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER

Minute Order -

10/30/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/7/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/11/2014: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF JOSHUA NORTON

7/1/2014: DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF JOSHUA NORTON

Minute Order -

7/15/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF OSC RE NON-APPEARANCE

7/16/2014: NOTICE OF OSC RE NON-APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

8/15/2014: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • DocketJudgment (JUDGMENT DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • DocketNotice (DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketNotice (OSC ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2013
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv (ALL DEFENDANTS) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

o — o 7

DAVID D. PIPER, CASB No. 179889

david.piper@kyl.com | Suner,Or%m‘E JOSHUA NORTON, CASB No. 292692 County o Lt of ca,,forma joshua.norton@kyl.como ¢ Angeles KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN . .

A Professional Corporation | SEP 04 ZUM‘

o Sherri 400 Oceangate, P.O. Box 1730 Recel - Carter, Exontin . .. Long Beach, California 90801-1730 Ved % S Sy Sicer/Cler Telephone: (562) 436-2000 A3 26 2014 Anthony 677 Deputy

Facsimile: (562) 436-7416

Attorneys for Defendants Filing Window JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSE SANCHEZ, an individual, Case No. BC498810

Plaintiff, Action Filed: January 9, 2013

VS. ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO:

| Judge Richard E. Rico, Dept. 17 JP MORGAN CHASE BANK;

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE £2ROPOSED] JUDGMENT

COMPANY and DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED DOES 1 - 20, inclusive, COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

Defendants. Date: August 14, 2014

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Place: Department 17 %Y F‘A}(

TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD: WHEREAS, on August 14, 2014, the Court dismissed the First Amended

Complaint of Plaintiff JOSE SANCHEZ (“Plaintiff’) with prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to appear at the July 15, 2014 Order to Show Cause (“OSC”) hearing and the August 14, 2014 OSC hearing,

IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 1s dismissed with prejudice; and Judgment is hereby entered in this

matter against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendants JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Reconveyance Company Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIPER DAVID D. ESQ.